EP1722854 - LED FORWARD VOLTAGE ESTIMATION IN PULSE OXIMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nellcor Puritan Bennett Incorporated 4280 Hacienda Drive Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | [2006/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEW, Bradford, B. 805 Springbrook Drive San Ramon, California 94583 / US | 02 /
PETERSEN, Ethan 18968 Thornbury Avenue Castro Valley, California 94546 / US | 03 /
SHEA, William 4049 Findlay Way Livermore, California 94550 / US | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Grubert, Andreas Baker Botts 41 Lothbury Street London EC2R 7HF / GB | [2006/47] | Application number, filing date | 05723884.2 | 25.02.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005US06205 | Priority number, date | US20040788243 | 25.02.2004 Original published format: US 788243 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005082455 | Date: | 09.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1722854 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/00, H05B33/08 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
A61B5/14546 (EP,US);
A61B5/02 (KR);
A61B5/00 (KR);
A61B5/024 (KR);
A61B5/14552 (EP,US);
H05B33/02 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LED-VORWÄRTS-SPANNUNGSSCHÄTZUNG IN EINEM PULSOXIMETER | [2006/47] | English: | LED FORWARD VOLTAGE ESTIMATION IN PULSE OXIMETER | [2006/47] | French: | ESTIMATION DE LA TENSION DIRECTE D'UNE DEL DANS UN SPHYGMO-OXYMETRE | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/04] | 02.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0477417 (HEWLETT PACKARD GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-10 * page 3, line 3 - line 34; figures 1,2 * * page 4, line 2 - line 55 * * page 5, line 44 - line 7, paragraph 47 *; | [I]WO03068060 (DATEX OHMEDA INC [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * page 1, line 15 - page 2, line 7; figures 1,2,12 * * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 8 * * page 14, line 26 - page 15, line 25 * * page 19, line 1 - line 29 * * page 21, line 1 - page 22, line 26 * * page 31, line 16 - line 17 *; | [A]US6560470 (POLOGE JONAS A [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 50 - column 3, line 8; figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 25 - line 65 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 25 *; | [A]US5859658 (HAMMOND THOMAS J [US]) [A] 1,5,6,10 * column 2, line 21 - line 67 * * column 5, line 7 - column 7, line 47 *; | [A]US6356774 (BERNSTEIN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 16 - line 60; figures 3,8-12 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 45 * * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 44 * * column 11, line 10 - column 13, line 41 * * column 17, line 27 - line 45 * |