EP1750925 - APPARATUS FOR APPLYING VARIABLE CODED LABELS TO ITEMS OF PRODUCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/07] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR APPLYING VARIABLE CODED LABELS TO ITEMS OF PRODUCE | ||
[2013/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sinclair Systems International, LLC. 3115 South Willow Avenue Fresno, CA 93725 / US | [2007/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRST, Richard Jarrold Way, Bowthrope Norwich NR5 9JD / GB | 02 /
EVANS, Richard 3115 South Willow Avenue Fresno, CA 93725 / US | 03 /
HOWARTH, Matthew, Scott 1054 North Coventry Avenue Clovis, CA 93611 / US | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2007/07] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05724670.4 | 03.03.2005 | [2007/07] | WO2005US07167 | Priority number, date | US20040549778P | 03.03.2004 Original published format: US 549778 P | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005084383 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1750925 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1750925 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65C9/18, B65C9/36, B65C9/46 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
B41J3/4075 (EP,US);
B65C9/188 (EP,US);
B65C9/36 (EP,US);
B65C9/46 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1707 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/07] | B29C65/00, B32B38/14, B32B37/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANBRINGEN VON VARIABEL CODIERTEN ETIKETTEN AUF ERZEUGNISSEN | [2013/18] | English: | APPARATUS FOR APPLYING VARIABLE CODED LABELS TO ITEMS OF PRODUCE | [2013/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINE A L'APPLICATION D'ETIQUETTES CODEES DIVERSES SUR DES PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES | [2013/18] |
Former [2007/07] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANBRINGEN VON VARIABEL CODIERTEN ETIKETTEN AUF ERZEUGNISSEN | ||
Former [2007/07] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR APPLYING VARIABLE CODED LABELS TO ITEMS OF PRODUCE | ||
Former [2007/07] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DESTINES A L'APPLICATION D'ETIQUETTES CODEES DIVERSES SUR DES PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 08.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2005 | BG | 21.08.2013 | CY | 21.08.2013 | CZ | 21.08.2013 | DK | 21.08.2013 | EE | 21.08.2013 | FI | 21.08.2013 | LT | 21.08.2013 | MC | 21.08.2013 | PL | 21.08.2013 | RO | 21.08.2013 | SE | 21.08.2013 | SI | 21.08.2013 | SK | 21.08.2013 | TR | 21.08.2013 | GR | 22.11.2013 | IS | 21.12.2013 | PT | 23.12.2013 | IE | 03.03.2014 | LU | 03.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 03.03.2005 | |
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.03.2014 | ||
LU | 03.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | BG | 21.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.03.2014 | ||
LU | 03.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 21.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.03.2014 | ||
LU | 03.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.03.2014 | ||
LU | 03.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.03.2014 | ||
LU | 03.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | LT | 21.08.2013 | |
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 21.08.2013 | |
PT | 23.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5317170 (PAOLI THOMAS L [US])[A] 1; | [A]US5413629 (YASUI TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1; | [A]US6179030 (RIETHEIMER WILLIAM R [US]) [A] 1; | [A]US6257294 (WEISBECK RICHARD WAYNE JOSEPH [CA]) [A] 1 * figures 1-13B * * column 3, line 20 - column 10, line 4 *; | [A]US2003207062 (HERZOG SILKE [DE], et al) [A] 1 | International search | [Y]US5317170 (PAOLI THOMAS L [US]); | [Y]US5413629 (YASUI TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al); | [Y]US6179030 (RIETHEIMER WILLIAM R [US]); | [X]US6257294 (WEISBECK RICHARD WAYNE JOSEPH [CA]); | [Y]US2003207062 (HERZOG SILKE [DE], et al) |