EP1722910 - FEEDSTOCK COMPOSITION FOR POWDER METALLURGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/47] | FEEDSTOCK COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF USING SAME FOR POWDER METALLURGY FORMING OF REACTIVE METALS | ||
[2008/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE Pacific Northwest Laboratories Intellectual Property Services 902 Battelle Boulevard P.O. Box 999 Richland, WA 99352 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Batelle Memorial Institute Pacific Northwest Division Intellectual Property Legal Services P.O. Box 999 Richland, WA 99352 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NYBERG, Eric, A. 2505 W. 37th Avenue Kennewick, WA 99337 / US | 02 /
WEIL, Kenneth, Scott 172 Orchard Way Richland, WA 99352 / US | 03 /
SIMMONS, Kevin, L. 1609 S. Rainier Street Kennewick, WA 99337 / US | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Rees, Kerry, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Rees, Kerry, et al FJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/47] | Brown, Fraser Gregory James, et al fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05724680.3 | 02.03.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005US07178 | Priority number, date | US20040796424 | 08.03.2004 Original published format: US 796424 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005087412 | Date: | 22.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1722910 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1722910 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B22F1/00, B22F3/22 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
B22F3/22 (EP,US);
B22F1/10 (EP,US);
B22F3/225 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F3/1017 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00, B22F3/225 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROHSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DIE PULVERMETALLURGIE | [2008/22] | English: | FEEDSTOCK COMPOSITION FOR POWDER METALLURGY | [2008/22] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CHARGE POUR METALLURGIE DES POUDRES | [2008/22] |
Former [2006/47] | ROHSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG FÜR DIE PULVERMETALLURGIE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON REAKTIVEN METALLEN | ||
Former [2006/47] | FEEDSTOCK COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF USING SAME FOR POWDER METALLURGY FORMING OF REACTIVE METALS | ||
Former [2006/47] | COMPOSITION DE CHARGE ET PROCEDE UTILISANT CETTE COMPOSITION DANS LA FORMATION DE METALLURGIE DES POUDRES DE METAUX REACTIFS | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 14.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.05.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.11.2008 | BE | 26.11.2008 | CY | 26.11.2008 | CZ | 26.11.2008 | DK | 26.11.2008 | EE | 26.11.2008 | FI | 26.11.2008 | LT | 26.11.2008 | NL | 26.11.2008 | PL | 26.11.2008 | RO | 26.11.2008 | SI | 26.11.2008 | SK | 26.11.2008 | TR | 26.11.2008 | BG | 26.02.2009 | SE | 26.02.2009 | GR | 27.02.2009 | IE | 02.03.2009 | LU | 02.03.2009 | ES | 08.03.2009 | IS | 26.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | PT | 27.04.2009 | HU | 27.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
PL | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
IE | 02.03.2009 | ||
LU | 02.03.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
HU | 27.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
PL | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
IE | 02.03.2009 | ||
LU | 02.03.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
PL | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
IE | 02.03.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
PL | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
IE | 02.03.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
PL | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
IE | 02.03.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
PL | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
PL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
PL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 26.11.2008 | |
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 08.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4894088 (YAMAGUCHI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,54,138,144 * abstract * * column 4 *; | [A]US5441695 (GLADDEN THOMAS [CH]) [A] * column 3 *; | [X]US5854379 (TAKAYAMA TAKEMORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,54,138,144 * abstract * * page 7, table 3;; claim 8 *; | [X]US6376585 (SCHOFALVI KARL-HEINZ [US], et al) [X] 1,54,138,144 * abstract * * columns 16-18 *; | [X]US2003091456 (BLOEMACHER MARTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1,54,138,144 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] - [0012] *; | [X]US2003220424 (SCHOFALVI KARL-HEINZ [US], et al) [X] 1,54,138,144 * paragraphs [0124] , [0130] *; | [X] - CHUNG C I ET AL, "New binder system for powder injection molding", PROC 1990 POWDER METALL CONF EXHIB; ADVANCES IN POWDER METALLURGY 1990 PUBL BY METAL POWDER INDUSTRIES FEDERATION, PRINCETON, NJ, USA, (1990), pages 193 - 211, XP009048747 [X] 1-147 * page 195 - page 196 * |