EP1725525 - DIPHENYLMETHYL COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS MUSCARINIC RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Theravance, Inc. 901 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAMMEN, Mathai 1852 Valparaiso Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
JI, Yu-Hua 700 Freeport Lane Redwood City, California 94065 / US | 03 /
DUNHAM, Sarah 10 Hawksburn Road South Yarra, Victoria 3141 / AU | 04 /
LI, Li 808 Trenton Drive Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Scott, Susan Margaret, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | Scott, Susan Margaret, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/27] | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | ||
Former [2007/40] | Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. & Martin A. Hay 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | ||
Former [2007/34] | Hay, Martin Alexander, et al Martin A. HAY & OFFICE ERNEST T.FREYLINGER S.A. White Cottage, 33 Castle Hill Prestbury Cheshire SK10 4AS / GB | ||
Former [2006/48] | Hay, Martin Alexander Martin A. Hay & Co. 13 Queen Victoria Street Macclesfield Cheshire SK11 6LP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05725274.4 | 10.03.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005US08013 | Priority number, date | US20040552368P | 11.03.2004 Original published format: US 552368 P | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005087722 | Date: | 22.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1725525 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/09, A61K31/40, A61P11/06 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K9/0075 (EP,US);
A61K9/0078 (EP,US);
A61K9/008 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 13.09.2006 | LV | 13.09.2006 | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALS MUSCARINREZEPTORANTAGONISTEN GEEIGNETE DIPHENYLMETHYLVERBINDUNGEN | [2006/48] | English: | DIPHENYLMETHYL COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS MUSCARINIC RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS | [2006/48] | French: | COMPOSES BIPHENYLE CONVENANT EN TANT QU'ANTAGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR MUSCARINIQUE | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 30.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/01] | 16.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0388054 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9109013 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9110647 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH11100366 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [PY]WO2004041806 (THERAVANCE INC [US], et al) [PY] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [PY]WO2004089892 (THERAVANCE INC [US], et al) [PY] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [PY]WO2005003090 (THERAVANCE INC [US], et al) [PY] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [PY]WO2005007645 (THERAVANCE INC [US], et al) [PY] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2005042514 (THERAVANCE INC [US], et al) [E] 1-26* the whole document * |