EP1735701 - HIGH-LEVEL PROGRAM INTERFACE FOR GRAPHICS OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2018/31] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | ||
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states APPLE COMPUTER, INC. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARPER, John 120 Duboce Avenue San Francisco, CA 94103-1104 / US | 02 /
BRUNNER, Ralph 10668 Maplewood Road B Cupertino, CA 95014-6023 / US | 03 /
GRAFFAGNINO, Peter, M. 235 Divisadero Street San Francisco, CA 94117-3206 / US | 04 /
ZIMMER, Mark, Alan 1800 Cabo Court Aptos, CA 95003-5800 / US | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2018/49] |
Former [2009/48] | Lang, Johannes, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenberg Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/41] | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/52] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05725763.6 | 16.03.2005 | [2006/52] | WO2005US08804 | Priority number, date | US20040826762 | 16.04.2004 Original published format: US 826762 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005106652 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1735701 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1735701 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/451, G06T1/20 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
G06T1/20 (EP);
G06F9/451 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/52] | G06F9/44, G06T1/00, G06T15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/49] |
Former [2006/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROGRAMMSCHNITTSTELLE AUF HOHER EBENE FÜR GRAPHIKOPERATIONEN | [2006/52] | English: | HIGH-LEVEL PROGRAM INTERFACE FOR GRAPHICS OPERATIONS | [2006/52] | French: | INTERFACE DE PROGRAMME DE HAUT NIVEAU POUR OPERATIONS GRAPHIQUES | [2006/52] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 19.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.11.2017 | 21.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 25.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP06026984.2 / EP1777618 | EP06026985.9 / EP1775680 | EP06027056.8 / EP1785850 | EP06027057.6 / EP1775681 | EP17178572.8 / EP3249522 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2005 | AT | 05.12.2018 | CY | 05.12.2018 | CZ | 05.12.2018 | DK | 05.12.2018 | EE | 05.12.2018 | ES | 05.12.2018 | FI | 05.12.2018 | IT | 05.12.2018 | LT | 05.12.2018 | MC | 05.12.2018 | NL | 05.12.2018 | PL | 05.12.2018 | RO | 05.12.2018 | SE | 05.12.2018 | SI | 05.12.2018 | SK | 05.12.2018 | TR | 05.12.2018 | BG | 05.03.2019 | GR | 06.03.2019 | GB | 16.03.2019 | IE | 16.03.2019 | LU | 16.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | FR | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | IS | 05.04.2019 | PT | 05.04.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
GB | 16.03.2019 | ||
IE | 16.03.2019 | ||
LU | 16.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
GB | 16.03.2019 | ||
IE | 16.03.2019 | ||
LU | 16.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
GB | 16.03.2019 | ||
IE | 16.03.2019 | ||
LU | 16.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IE | 16.03.2019 | ||
LU | 16.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LU | 16.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 05.12.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0694879 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [X] 28,43,75-78 * Summary of the invention * * page 5, line 48 - line 49 * * page 5, line 57 * * page 6, line 22 - line 55 * * page 7, line 41 - line 53 * * page 8, line 52 - line 58 * * page 9, line 3 - line 5 * * page 15, line 15 - page 16, line 36 *; | [X]US5490246 (BROTSKY DANIEL C [US], et al) [X] 1-57,79,80,84,85 * abstract * * column 3, line 7 - line 45 * * column 6, line 37 - column 13, line 45 * * column 14, line 35 - line 53 * * column 17, line 48 - column 20, line 25 *; | [X]WO9845815 (INTERGRAPH CORP [US]) [X] 1,22,58-74,79-85 * page 5, line 14 - line 24 * * page 6, line 1 - page 9, line 29 *; | [A]US6006231 (POPA SORIN [CA]) [A] 1,22,79,80,84,85 * column 1, line 50 - line 59 * * column 4, line 43 - line 67 * * column 6, line 25 - line 30 * * column 10, line 22 - line 35 *; | [X]US6272558 (HUI JONATHAN [US], et al) [X] 1,74,79,80,84,85 * column 2, line 35 - line 64 * * column 3, line 62 - line 67 * * column 4, line 42 - line 67 * * column 6, line 12 - line 60 * * column 10, line 9 - line 20 *; | [A]EP1383080 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 74,75* paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] *; | [A]US6717599 (OLANO THOMAS M [US]) [A] 28,43,75 * abstract * * column 4, line 11 - line 53 * |