EP1725094 - DEVICE FOR TRAPPING FLYING INSECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Woodstream Corporation 69 North Locust Street Lititz PA 17543 / US | [2008/40] |
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states American Biophysics Corporation 140 Frenchtown Road North Kingstown, RI 02852 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DURAND, Emma A. 64 Walcott Avenue Jamestown, Rhode Island 02835 / US | 02 /
PALOMBO, Michael J. 5 Marigold Drive Warwick, RI 02889 / US | 03 /
DUNNE, Richard B. 2 Laurel Lane Jamestown, Rhode Island 02835 / US | [2016/03] |
Former [2006/48] | 01 /
DURAND, Emma, A. 64 Walcott Avenue Jamestown, Rhode Island 02835 / US | ||
02 /
PALOMBO, Michael, J. 5 Marigold Drive Warwick, RI 02889 / US | |||
03 /
DUNNE, Richard, B. 2 Laurel Lane Jamestown, Rhode Island 02835 / US | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2006/48] | Freeman, Avi Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05725960.8 | 21.03.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005US09256 | Priority number, date | US20040554409P | 19.03.2004 Original published format: US 554409 P | US20050083090 | 18.03.2005 Original published format: US 83090 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005092020 | Date: | 06.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1725094 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1725094 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01M1/06, A01M1/10, A01M5/00, A01M5/08, A01M1/00 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
A01M1/06 (EP,US);
A01M1/023 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/25] | A01M1/06 | ||
Former IPC [2006/48] | A01M1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2006/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM FANGEN VON FLIEGENDEN INSEKTEN | [2006/48] | English: | DEVICE FOR TRAPPING FLYING INSECTS | [2006/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINE A PIEGER DES INSECTES VOLANTS | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 16.04.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 20.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.03.2005 | AT | 20.01.2016 | BE | 20.01.2016 | CY | 20.01.2016 | CZ | 20.01.2016 | DK | 20.01.2016 | EE | 20.01.2016 | ES | 20.01.2016 | LT | 20.01.2016 | MC | 20.01.2016 | NL | 20.01.2016 | PL | 20.01.2016 | RO | 20.01.2016 | SI | 20.01.2016 | SK | 20.01.2016 | TR | 20.01.2016 | IE | 21.03.2016 | LU | 21.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | GR | 21.04.2016 | IS | 20.05.2016 | PT | 20.05.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.03.2005 | |
AT | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 21.03.2016 | ||
LU | 21.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 21.03.2016 | ||
LU | 21.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 21.03.2016 | ||
LU | 21.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
LU | 21.03.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
LU | 21.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
LU | 21.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
LU | 21.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 20.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS4514917Y (UNKOWN) [Y] 25 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5189830 (MONTEMURRO DONALD [US]) [Y] 25 * the whole document *; | [XDYI]US6145243 (WIGTON BRUCE E [US], et al) [XD] 1-3,9,17,21,22,33,35 * figures 1,3 * * column 5, lines 42-43,52 * * column 6, lines 25-30 * * column 7, lines 47-65 * * column 9, lines 12-17 * [Y] 25,28,29,31 [I] 4-8,11-16,23,24; | [Y]WO03028448 (AMERICAN BIOPHYSICS CORP [US]) [Y] 25,28,29,31 * figure 4 *; | [A] - "CATALYTIC BURNER LITERATURE TELEDYNE BROWN SYSTEMS", CATALYTIC BURNER LITERATURE, XX, XX, (19970101), page COMPLETE, XP002918262 [A] 1,25,33,35 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4324062 (SCHNEIDER FRED A); | [X]US6145243 (WIGTON BRUCE E [US], et al); | [A]US6286249 (MILLER MARK H [US], et al); | [Y]US2003084604 (DURAND EMMA A [US], et al) | Examination | US4368777 | by applicant | US6145243 | US6286249 | US6817140 | US6840005 |