EP1751351 - EFFECTIVE REDUCTIVE BLEACHING OF MINERAL SLURRIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imerys Pigments, Inc. 100 Mansell Court East, Suite 300 Roswell, GA 30076 / US | [2007/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUAN, Jun 119 Springfield Lane Warner Robins, GA 31088 / US | 02 /
PRUETT, Robert, J. 113 Cambridge Drive N. Milledgeville, GA 31061 / US | 03 /
POWELL, Larry, C. Route 3, Box 1470 Wrightsville, GA 31096 / US | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Rushton, David John Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | Rushton, David John HASELTINE LAKE Redcliff Quay, 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05725986.3 | 22.03.2005 | [2007/07] | WO2005US09355 | Priority number, date | US20040555401P | 23.03.2004 Original published format: US 555401 P | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005095709 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1751351 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D21H19/44, D21H17/67, D21H17/09 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
D21H19/44 (EP,US);
D21H19/385 (EP,US);
Y02E60/32 (US)
|
Former IPC [2007/07] | D21H19/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM WIRKSAMEN REDUKTIVEN BLEICHEN VON MINERALAUFSCHLÄMMUNGEN | [2007/07] | English: | EFFECTIVE REDUCTIVE BLEACHING OF MINERAL SLURRIES | [2007/07] | French: | BLANCHIMENT REDUCTEUR EFFICACE DE PATES MINERALES | [2007/07] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 29.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0069977 (IMERYS MINERALS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-41 * the whole document *; | [A]US6602385 (DRUMMOND DONALD KENDALL [US]) [A] 1-41 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19530062 (DORFNER GMBH & CO KAOLIN UND K [DE]) [A] 1-41 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0170644 (IMERYS MINERALS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-41 * the whole document *; | [A]US4859246 (SENNETT PAUL [US]) [A] 1-41 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9001581 (LUMALAMPAN AB [SE]) [A] 1-41 * the whole document *; | [A]US5227349 (MATTHEWS KIRT L [US], et al) [A] 1-41 * the whole document * |