EP1704437 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING CENTERING DATA USED FOR EYEGLASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Vision GmbH Turnstrasse 27 73430 Aalen / DE | [2006/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSS-MESSEMER, Martin Am Steinriegel 13 73457 Essingen / DE | 02 /
KUBITZA, Matthias Droste-Hülshoff-Weg 29 73431 Aalen / DE | 03 /
HÖLLER, Frank Milanweg 25 73434 Aalen / DE | 04 /
KRUG, Herbert Edmund-Kohler-Strasse 24 73433 Aalen / DE | 05 /
WEGENDT, Holger An der Lauter 20/1 73563 Mögglingen / DE | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Braunger, Dieter Carl Zeiss AG Patentabteilung Carl-Zeiss-Straße 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [2015/27] |
Former [2006/39] | Braunger, Dieter Carl Zeiss AG Patentabteilung Carl-Zeiss-Straße 22 D-73447 Oberkochen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05726214.9 | 14.01.2005 | [2006/39] | WO2005EP00390 | Priority number, date | DE20041002651 | 16.01.2004 Original published format: DE102004002651 | DE20041045013 | 15.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004045013 | [2006/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005069063 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1704437 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1704437 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02C13/00 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
G02C13/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERMITTELN VON ZENTRIERDATEN FÜR EINE BRILLE | [2006/39] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING CENTERING DATA USED FOR EYEGLASSES | [2006/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE DONNEES DE CENTRAGE POUR DES LUNETTES | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 23.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.01.2005 | BG | 01.07.2015 | CY | 01.07.2015 | CZ | 01.07.2015 | DK | 01.07.2015 | EE | 01.07.2015 | FI | 01.07.2015 | LT | 01.07.2015 | MC | 01.07.2015 | RO | 01.07.2015 | SE | 01.07.2015 | SI | 01.07.2015 | SK | 01.07.2015 | GR | 02.10.2015 | IS | 01.11.2015 | IE | 14.01.2016 | LU | 14.01.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.01.2005 | |
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
IE | 14.01.2016 | ||
LU | 14.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
IE | 14.01.2016 | ||
LU | 14.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
LU | 14.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
LU | 14.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 01.07.2015 | |
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 01.07.2015 | |
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 01.07.2015 | |
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 01.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE10033983 (MOTHES FRANK [DE]) [Y] 1-19 * abstract *; | [YD]EP0812098 (ZEISS CARL [DE], et al) [YD] 1-19 * paragraph [0003]; figures 1a,1b *; | [YD]US5129400 (MAKINO MISAO [JP], et al) [YD] 4-17 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 30; figure 1 *; | [Y]GB2205661 (LEY NIGEL GEOFFREY) [Y] 14,15 * figure 6; claim 1 * | [Y] - KERSTEN D ET AL, "Convergece accommodation"", Journal of the Optical Society of America USA, (198303), vol. 73, no. 3, ISSN 0030-3941, pages 322 - 328, XP002326184 [Y] 1-19 * page 333, column L, paragraph APPARATUS * | by applicant | EP0812098 | DE10033983 | US5129400 |