EP1712095 - A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, A COMMUNICATION TERMINAL AND A METHOD OF DETERMINING A LOCATION ESTIMATE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2006/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLISON, Robert J. 41 Cibbons Road, Basingstoke Basingstoke, Hampshire, RG24 8TD / GB | 02 /
CARTER, Michael J. Severn View Gloucester, Gloucestershire GL2 3ST / GB | 03 /
HUNTINGFORD, Dave 111 Wootton Drive Hemel Hempstead, HT, HP2 6LD / GB | 04 /
CARPIO, Raul, E. 12 Paterson Close Basingstoke, HANTS RG22 4NX / GB | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | McCormack, Derek James, et al Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | [2008/45] |
Former [2006/42] | McCormack, Derek James, et al Optimus Grove House, Lutyens Close, Chineham Court, Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | Application number, filing date | 05726325.3 | 25.01.2005 | [2006/42] | WO2005US02456 | Priority number, date | GB20040003118 | 28.01.2004 Original published format: GB 0403118 | [2006/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005072362 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1712095 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/20 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
G01S19/05 (EP);
H04W8/14 (EP);
H04W64/00 (EP);
H04W84/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER POSITIONSSCHÄTZUNG DAFÜR | [2006/42] | English: | A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, A COMMUNICATION TERMINAL AND A METHOD OF DETERMINING A LOCATION ESTIMATE THEREFOR | [2006/42] | French: | SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATION, TERMINAL DE TELECOMMUNICATION ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER UNE ESTIMATION DE POSITION POUR CE DERNIER | [2006/42] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 21.12.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003011511 (KING THOMAS M [US], et al); | [YP]US2004147223 (CHO KWANG SUN [KR]); | [A]US6885337 (JENDBRO MAGNUS [SE], et al) |