EP1715892 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR MODULATING ANGIOGENESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ChemoCentryx, Inc. 850 Maude Avenue Mountain View California 94043 / US | [2006/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURNS, Jennifer 500 Walnut Street Royersford, PA 19468 / US | 02 /
SUMMERS, Bretton 1045 Mission Street, 418 San Francisco, CA 94103-5816 / US | 03 /
WANG, Yu 235 Isleford Lane Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 04 /
HOWARD, Maureen 12700 Viscaino Road Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 05 /
SCHALL, Thomas 563 Homer Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 06 /
MIAO, Zhenhua 7070 Rainbow Drive, 2 San Jose, CA 95129 / US | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Broughton, Jon Philip, et al Avidity IP Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane, Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Broughton, Jon Philip, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05726389.9 | 02.02.2005 | [2006/44] | WO2005US03521 | Priority number, date | US20040541849P | 03.02.2004 Original published format: US 541849 P | US20040598958P | 04.08.2004 Original published format: US 598958 P | US20040626195P | 08.11.2004 Original published format: US 626195 P | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005074645 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1715892 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K38/00, A61P17/02, A61P19/02, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, C07D207/00, C07K16/28 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
A61K38/195 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/195, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/44] | A61K39/395, A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Extension states | AL | 18.08.2006 | BA | 18.08.2006 | HR | 18.08.2006 | LV | 18.08.2006 | MK | 18.08.2006 | YU | 18.08.2006 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR MODULATION DER ANGIOGENESE | [2006/44] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR MODULATING ANGIOGENESIS | [2006/44] | French: | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT DE MODULER L'ANGIOGENESE | [2006/44] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 24.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9947158 (UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002107195 (GUPTA SHALLEY K [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 14 * * claims 1-6 *; | [A]WO02094261 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 13,17 * & EP1389460 (2004-02-18); pages 116-117; figures 6,7 *; | [PX]WO2004058705 (CHEMOCENTRYX [US]) [PX] 1,2,7,10 * page 1 - page 3 * * page 25, paragraph 1 * * page 28, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 109, paragraph 2 - page 111, paragraph 1 *; | [PX]WO2004062591 (UNIV OREGON HEALTH & SCIENCE [US], et al) [PX] 1,2,7,8 * page 35, lines 4-6 * * page 47, lines 16-29 * * page 48 - page 52 * * tables 1-4 *; | [X] - SALVUCCI OMBRETTA ET AL, "Regulation of endothelial cell branching morphogenesis by endogenous chemokine stromal-derived factor-1.", BLOOD 15 APR 2002, (20020415), vol. 99, no. 8, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2703 - 2711, XP002481675 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood.V99.8.2703 | [A] - PHILLIPS RODERICK J ET AL, "The stromal derived factor-1/CXCL12-CXC chemokine receptor 4 biological axis in non-small cell lung cancer metastases.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY AND CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE 15 JUN 2003, (20030615), vol. 167, no. 12, ISSN 1073-449X, pages 1676 - 1686, XP002481676 [A] 1-17 * page 1682 - page 1683 * * figures 10,11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1164/rccm.200301-071OC | [A] - MUELLER ANJA ET AL, "Involvement of chemokine receptors in breast cancer metastasis", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, (20010301), vol. 410, no. 6824, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 50 - 56, XP002292390 [A] 1-17 * page 51, column R, paragraph 5; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35065016 | [A] - PROUDFOOT A E I ET AL, "STRATEGIES FOR CHEMOKINE ANTAGONISTS AS THERAPEUTICS", SEMINARS IN IMMUNOLOGY, W.B. SAUNDERS COMPANY, PA, US, (20030101), vol. 15, no. 1, ISSN 1044-5323, pages 57 - 65, XP001156225 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1044-5323(02)00128-8 | [A] - SALCEDO ROSALBA ET AL, "Role of chemokines in angiogenesis: CXCL12/SDF-1 and CXCR4 interaction, a key regulator of endothelial cell responses.", MICROCIRCULATION (NEW YORK, N.Y. : 1994) JUN 2003, (200306), vol. 10, no. 3-4, ISSN 1073-9688, pages 359 - 370, XP008091927 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.mn.7800200 | [T] - BURNS JENNIFER M ET AL, "A novel chemokine receptor for SDF-1 and I-TAC involved in cell survival, cell adhesion, and tumor development", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, TOKYO, JP, (20060901), vol. 203, no. 9, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 2201 - 2213, XP002447048 [T] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20052144 | [T] - MIAO ZHENHUA ET AL, "CXCR7 (RDC1) promotes breast and lung tumor growth in vivo and is expressed on tumor-associated vasculature", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (200710), vol. 104, no. 40, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 15735 - 15740, XP002481677 [T] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0610444104 | International search | [X]US2004019917 (BARNES THOMAS M [US], et al) |