EP1769656 - FLEXIBLE EL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states El Korea Corporation 82-2 Munpyeong-dong, Daedeok-gu Daejon 306-220 / KR | [2007/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Dong Hyuk 123-1 Yeonhui-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-110 / KR | 02 /
BAE, Kwang Hyuk 82-2 Munpyeong-dong Daedeok-gu Daejeon 306-220 / KR | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Skuhra, Udo ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Skuhra, Udo Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05726901.1 | 14.03.2005 | [2007/14] | WO2005KR00721 | Priority number, date | KR20040043546 | 14.06.2004 Original published format: KR 2004043546 | [2007/14] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005122643 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1769656 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/00 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
H05B33/10 (EP,US);
H05B33/00 (KR);
H05B33/145 (EP,US);
H05B33/22 (EP,KR,US);
H05B33/28 (EP,US);
H10K2102/311 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLES EL-BAUELEMENT | [2007/14] | English: | FLEXIBLE EL DEVICE | [2007/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF ELECTROLUMINESCENT SOUPLE | [2007/14] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2005 | Translation filed | 13.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 15.03.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5856030 (BURROWS KENNETH [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 59 * * column 4, line 51 - column 6, line 38 * * claims 1-11 *; | [X]WO02103718 (E L SPECIALISTS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * pages 6,10-20 ** figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]JPH10321369 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000012213 (OJI PAPER CO); | [Y]US6521359 (NOGUCHI TAKANOBU [JP], et al) |