EP1742991 - METHOD FOR FORMING SURFACE GRAFT, METHOD FOR FORMING CONDUCTIVE FILM, METHOD FOR FORMING METAL PATTERN, METHOD FOR FORMING MULTILAYER WIRING BOARD, SURFACE GRAFT MATERIAL, AND CONDUCTIVE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANO, Takeyoshi FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 577-1, Ushizima, Kaisei-Machi Ashigarakami-Gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 02 /
KAWAMURA, Koichi FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 577-1, Ushizima, Kaisei-Machi Ashigarakami-Gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05727375.7 | 24.03.2005 | [2007/03] | WO2005JP06218 | Priority number, date | JP20040087980 | 24.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004087980 | JP20040163783 | 01.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004163783 | [2007/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005090454 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1742991 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/18, C23C18/16, C23C18/20, C08J7/16 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
C08J7/12 (EP,US);
C08J7/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/22 (KR);
C08J7/0423 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/044 (EP,US);
C23C18/1601 (EP,US);
C23C18/1653 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/1692 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/2006 (EP,US);
C23C18/2086 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/28 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/34 (EP,KR,US);
H05K3/389 (EP,KR,US);
H05K3/4661 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2379/08 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4913 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49155 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49156 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4921 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/03] | C08J7/18, C23C18/16, C23C18/20 | Designated contracting states | DE [2007/26] |
Former [2007/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG EINER OBERFLÄCHENPFROPFUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG EINES LEITFÄHIGEN FILMS, VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG EINER METALLSTRUKTUR, VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG EINER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN VERDRAHTUNGSPLATTE, OBERFLÄCHENPFROPFMATERIAL UND LEITFÄHIGES MATERIAL | [2007/03] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING SURFACE GRAFT, METHOD FOR FORMING CONDUCTIVE FILM, METHOD FOR FORMING METAL PATTERN, METHOD FOR FORMING MULTILAYER WIRING BOARD, SURFACE GRAFT MATERIAL, AND CONDUCTIVE MATERIAL | [2007/03] | French: | PROCEDE D'ELABORATION D'UNE SURFACE GREFFEE, PROCEDE D'ELABORATION DE FILM CONDUCTEUR, PROCEDE D'ELABORATION D'UN MOTIF DE METAL, PROCEDE D'ELABORATION DE CARTE DE CONNEXION MULTICOUCHE, MATERIAU DE SURFACE GREFFEE | [2007/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 17.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 10.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06316759 ; | [XI]US6537411 (KANG EN-TANG [SG], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 3, lines 8-66; example -; claim - * [I] 15-20; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 05, Database accession no. 1995-032936, XP002672774 & JPH06316759 A 19941115 (TOMOEGAWA SEISHISHO KK) [X] 1-14 * abstract * | [X] - N. INAGAKI ET AL, "Improved Adhesion between Kapton Film and Copper Metal by Plasma Graft Polymerization of Vinylimidazole", MACROMOLECULES, (19960101), vol. 29, no. 5, doi:10.1021/ma9503571, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 1642 - 1648, XP055023563 [X] 1-14 * Experimental Section * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma9503571 | [X] - "Activating plastic surfaces for electroless plating", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1984:140440, URL: STN, XP002672775 [X] 1-20 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS58196238 (TOYO INK MFG CO); | [A]US5587209 (SOGA MAMORU [JP], et al) |