EP1730635 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ACHIEVING THERMAL MANAGEMENT USING PROCESSING TASK SCHEDULING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | [2006/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, Keisuke SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | [2007/41] |
Former [2006/50] | 01 /
INOUE, Keisuke SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama, Minato-ku Tokyo 1070062 / JP | Representative(s) | Turner, James Arthur D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Turner, James Arthur D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05727578.6 | 28.03.2005 | [2006/50] | WO2005JP06523 | Priority number, date | US20040812177 | 29.03.2004 Original published format: US 812177 | [2006/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005096150 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1730635 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1730635 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
G06F9/4893 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/3814 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/206 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/3203 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/329 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/1221 (KR);
G06F9/3836 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/3869 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/4405 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORICHTUNGEN ZUR ERZIELUNG DER THERMISCHEN VERWALTUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON VERARBEITUNGS-TASK-EINTEILUNG | [2006/50] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ACHIEVING THERMAL MANAGEMENT USING PROCESSING TASK SCHEDULING | [2006/50] | French: | PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER UNE GESTION THERMIQUE PAR ORDONNANCEMENT DE TACHES DE TRAITEMENT | [2006/50] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 17.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.02.2008 | BE | 27.02.2008 | CY | 27.02.2008 | CZ | 27.02.2008 | DK | 27.02.2008 | EE | 27.02.2008 | FI | 27.02.2008 | IT | 27.02.2008 | LT | 27.02.2008 | NL | 27.02.2008 | PL | 27.02.2008 | RO | 27.02.2008 | SI | 27.02.2008 | SK | 27.02.2008 | TR | 27.02.2008 | IE | 28.03.2008 | LU | 28.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | BG | 27.05.2008 | SE | 27.05.2008 | GR | 28.05.2008 | ES | 07.06.2008 | IS | 27.06.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | HU | 28.08.2008 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/39] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
TR | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 28.03.2008 | ||
LU | 28.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
HU | 28.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 28.03.2008 | ||
LU | 28.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 28.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 28.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 28.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 28.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002065049 (CHAUVEL GERARD [FR], et al) [X] 1-89 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0065] *; | [X] - TIEN-CHIEN LEE M ET AL, "POWER ANALYSIS AND MINIMIZATION TECHNIQUES FOR EMBEDDED DSP SOFTWARE", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VERY LARGE SCALE INTEGRATION (VLSI) SYSTEMS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199703), vol. 5, no. 1, ISSN 1063-8210, pages 123 - 135, XP000679029 [X] 1-89 * page 123 - page 133 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/92.555992 | [A] - SEONGMOO HEO ET AL, "Reducing power density through activity migration", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2003 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON LOW POWER ELECTRONICS AND DESIGN. ISLPED'03. SEOUL, KOREA, AUG. 25 - 27, 2003, INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON LOW POWER ELCTRONICS AND DESIGN, NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (20030825), ISBN 1-58113-682-X, pages 217 - 222, XP010658639 [A] 1-89 * page 217 - page 221 * | [A] - SKADRON K ET AL, "Temperature-aware microarchitecture: Modeling and Implementation", ACN TRANSACTIONS ON ARCHITECTURE AND CODE OPTIMIZATION, (200403), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1544-3566, pages 94 - 125, XP002341524 [A] 1-89 * page 94 - page 121 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/980152.980157 |