EP1731317 - THERMAL TRANSFER PRINTER FOR FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2006/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMURA, Y.; c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 1628001 / JP | 02 /
ASO, K.; c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 1628001 / JP | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Needle, Jacqueline Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Needle, Jacqueline Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05727603.2 | 30.03.2005 | [2006/50] | WO2005JP06061 | Priority number, date | JP20040099811 | 30.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004099811 | [2006/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005095110 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1731317 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/325, B41J15/16, B65H18/10 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
B65H16/00 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/325 (EP,KR,US);
B41J11/04 (KR);
B41J17/16 (EP,KR,US);
B41J3/407 (EP,KR,US);
B41J35/23 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/27] |
Former [2006/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOLIEN-WÄRMETRANSFERDRUCKER | [2006/50] | English: | THERMAL TRANSFER PRINTER FOR FILM | [2006/50] | French: | IMPRIMANTE A TRANSFERT THERMIQUE POUR FILM | [2006/50] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2006 | Translation filed | 13.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 07.09.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63104862 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]US5179390 (YOKOYAMA MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 7, line 61 - column 8, line 8; figure 5 *; | [X]JPH05155076 (EASTMAN KODAK CO) [X] 1-3,6-8 * abstract *; | [XY]JP2001180070 (WEDGE KK) [X] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * [Y] 4,5,9,10; | [A]EP1211082 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,5; claim 1 *; | [Y]JP2003154694 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 4,5,9,10 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2003127448 (DAISEY MACHINERY CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001180070 (WEDGE KK); | [Y]JPH05155076 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [Y]JP2003154694 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) |