EP1739478 - PARTICLES FOR DISPLAY MEDIUM, INFORMATION DISPLAY PANEL EMPLOYING SAME, AND INFORMATION DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAGA, Norihiko 3-5-5, Ogawahigashi-cho, Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 1870031 / JP | 02 /
ARAI, Toshiaki 5-9-15-303, Nishifuna, Funabashi-shi, Chiba 2730031 / JP | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/17] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/01] | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre GB-London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05727793.1 | 29.03.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005JP05902 | Priority number, date | JP20040115235 | 09.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004115235 | JP20040304186 | 19.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004304186 | [2007/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005098525 | Date: | 20.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1739478 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/167, G02F1/17, G09F9/37 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
G09F9/37 (EP,US);
G02F1/1671 (EP,US);
G02F2001/1678 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/29] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEILCHEN FÜR EIN DISPLAY-MEDIUM, INFORMATIONS-DISPLAY-TAFEL DAMIT UND INFORMATIONS-DISPLAY | [2007/01] | English: | PARTICLES FOR DISPLAY MEDIUM, INFORMATION DISPLAY PANEL EMPLOYING SAME, AND INFORMATION DISPLAY | [2007/01] | French: | PARTICULES POUR SUPPORT D'AFFICHAGE, PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE D'INFORMATIONS L'UTILISANT ET AFFICHAGE D'INFORMATIONS | [2007/12] |
Former [2007/01] | PARTICULES POUR SUPPORT D"AFFICHAGE, PANNEAU D"AFFICHAGE D"INFORMATIONS L"UTILISANT ET AFFICHAGE D"INFORMATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2006 | Translation filed | 09.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 23.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0709713 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * figures 2,22A,22B * * page 6, line 5 - line 29 * * page 13, line 14 - page 14, line 2 *; | JPH08137416 [ ] (FUJIKURA LTD, et al) [ ] * paragraph [0062]; figure 5 * | International search | [Y]JPH08137416 (FUJIKURA LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2000035768 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JP2002072256 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [Y]JP2002236300 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]WO03027764 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) |