EP1712304 - RECORDING MEDIUM DESTRUCTING DEVICE, RECORDING MEDIUM DESTRUCTING SYSTEM, ELECTRONIC APPARATUS MANAGING DEVICE, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orient Instrument Computer Co., Ltd 35F Crystal Tower, 2-27, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi 540-6035 / JP | [2006/46] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states Orient Instrument Computer Co., Ltd 17-19, Shiginonishi 1-chome, Joto-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 536-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Tomoaki, ORIENT INSTRUMENT COMPUTER CO., LTD. 17-19, Shiginonishi 1-chome, Joto-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5360014 / JP | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Paul, Dieter-Alfred Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Paul, Dieter-Alfred Paul & Albrecht Patentanwaltssozietät Hellersbergstrasse 18 41460 Neuss / DE | ||
Former [2006/42] | Paul, Dieter-Alfred Paul & Albrecht Patentanwaltssozietät Hellersbergstrasse 18 D-41460 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 05727842.6 | 29.03.2005 | [2006/42] | WO2005JP05818 | Priority number, date | JP20040103186 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004103186 | JP20040150238 | 20.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004150238 | JP20040210371 | 16.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004210371 | JP20040335557 | 19.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004335557 | JP20050032488 | 09.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005032488 | JP20050068523 | 11.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005068523 | [2006/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005095010 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1712304 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B09B5/00, G11B33/00 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
B29B17/0412 (EP,US);
G11B33/00 (KR);
B02C18/0007 (EP,US);
B02C18/148 (EP,US);
B09B5/00 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G11B23/505 (EP,US);
G11B7/0055 (KR);
B02C2018/0015 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUMZERSTÖRUNGSVORRICHTUNG, AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUMZERSTÖRUNGSSYSTEM, VERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE GERÄTE UND RECHNERPROGRAMM | [2006/42] | English: | RECORDING MEDIUM DESTRUCTING DEVICE, RECORDING MEDIUM DESTRUCTING SYSTEM, ELECTRONIC APPARATUS MANAGING DEVICE, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2006/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DESTRUCTION DE SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT, SYSTEME DE DESTRUCTION DE SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT, DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE D'APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2006/42] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2006 | Translation filed | 28.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 10.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/16] | 18.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000042440 (NITSUKO LTD) [A] 1-8,10-12 * abstract *; | [AD]US2003006330 (CHANG FRANK [TW]) [AD] 1-8,10-12* abstract *; | [X]US2003146275 (BENNETT BRUCE A [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0043]; claims 1,12,14,15,22 *; | [AD]JP2004071057 (JAPAN PULSE LAB INC) [AD] 1-8,10-12 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US2003006330 (CHANG FRANK [TW]); | [Y]JP2003034436 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JP2003141278 (CF NET S KK); | [A]JP2003280993 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JP2004071057 (JAPAN PULSE LAB INC) |