EP1728174 - METHOD OF SENDING INFORMATION THROUGH A TREE AND RING TOPOLOGY OF A NETWORK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVA Optical Networking Ltd. ADVAntage House Tribune Way York YO30 4RY / GB | [2010/01] |
Former [2006/49] | For all designated states Metro Packet Systems Inc. 3851 Dixon Place Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORAVA, Fredrik Nydal 5 S-193 91 Sigtuna / SE | 02 /
RAMFELT, Lars 3851 Dixon Place Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/46] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Söderman, Päivi Karin Lisbeth, et al BORENIUS & Co Oy Ab Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2006/49] | Söderman, Päivi Karin Lisbeth Iprbox Oy Keilaranta 14 02150 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 05729074.4 | 12.03.2005 | [2006/49] | WO2005US07976 | Priority number, date | US20040810934 | 26.03.2004 Original published format: US 810934 | [2006/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005104447 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1728174 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/173, H04L12/46 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
H04L12/4645 (EP,US);
H04L41/12 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (US);
H04L45/48 (EP,US);
H04L45/76 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/49] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN VON INFORMATIONEN DURCH EINE BAUM- UND RINGTOPOLOGIE EINES NETZWERKSYSTEMS | [2006/49] | English: | METHOD OF SENDING INFORMATION THROUGH A TREE AND RING TOPOLOGY OF A NETWORK SYSTEM | [2006/49] | French: | PROCEDE D'ENVOI D'INFORMATIONS PAR UNE TOPOLOGIE EN ANNEAU ET EN ARBRE D'UN SYSTEME DE RESEAU | [2006/49] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 13.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/11] | 08.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0113555 (HOLONTECH CORP [US]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [T] - ACTIONTEC, "Modular DSLRouter", 20080101, (20080101), pages 1 - 4, XP007917145 [T] * the whole document * | [T] - ADVA OPTICAL NETWORKING, "FSP 150CP. The Ethernet Access Platform", 20070101, (20070101), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.pss.com.mx/docs/fsp150CP_2007.pdf, XP007917146 [T] * the whole document * | International search | [AE]US2005213582 (WAKUMOTO SHAUN K [US], et al); | [AE]US2005213577 (SHOBATAKE YASURO [US]) | Examination | US6496502 | EP1351449 |