EP1733212 - INSPECTION SYSTEM FOR BLISTER PACKAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED One Bausch & Lomb Place Rochester, NY 14604-2701 / US | [2006/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRY, Paud Knock House Gracedieu, County Waterford / IE | 02 /
MURPHY, Michael, W. Woodstown County, Waterford / IE | 03 /
ROCHE, Eoin 4 Ferndale, Ashley Court Waterford / IE | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/51] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05729079.3 | 22.03.2005 | [2006/51] | WO2005US09510 | Priority number, date | US20040813860 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: US 813860 | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005100959 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1733212 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/84, B07C5/34, B65B25/00 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
B07C5/3422 (EP,US);
B65B25/008 (EP,US);
G01N21/9054 (EP,US);
G01N21/9508 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRÜFSYSTEM FÜR BLISTERPACKUNGEN | [2006/51] | English: | INSPECTION SYSTEM FOR BLISTER PACKAGES | [2006/51] | French: | SYSTEME D'INSPECTION POUR EMBALLAGES ALVEOLAIRES | [2006/51] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 27.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/15] | 23.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4245243 (GUTJAHR LOTHAR, et al) [Y] 6 * column 5, line 38 - column 8, line 19 * * column 9, line 13 - line 22; figures 1-3 * [A] 7; | [YA]DE3622112 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 16 - line 44 * [A] 2; | [XAY]US5363968 (SOLOMAN SABRIE B [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 26 - line 62 * * column 5, line 34 - line 37; figures 1-4; claim 14 * [A] 2 [Y] 1; | [YA]EP0741078 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION PROD [US]) [Y] 1 * column 14, line 30 - column 15, line 45; figure 1 * [A] 2; | [Y]EP1020381 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION PROD [US]) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0077]; figures 20-22 *; | [Y]US2001009561 (BIEL ROGER [DE]) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0029] *; | [YA]US2001016059 (KRAHN ANDREAS [DE], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019]; figure 1 * [A] 2; | [A]US2002077771 (MERTENS RICHARD [DE], et al) [A] 6* paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * |