EP1796296 - THE QUICK PROTECTION METHOD IN OPTICAL RING NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Desheng, ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Dis., Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05729106.4 | 16.03.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005CN00321 | Priority number, date | CN20041080096 | 28.09.2004 Original published format: CN200410080096 | [2007/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006034614 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1796296 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/08, H04J14/02 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
H04J14/0283 (EP);
H04B10/032 (EP,KR);
H04B10/275 (KR);
H04J14/0273 (EP);
H04J3/085 (EP,KR);
H04L41/0654 (KR);
H04J14/0227 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/24] | H04B10/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNELLES SCHUTZVERFAHREN IN EINEM OPTISCHEN RINGNETZ | [2007/24] | English: | THE QUICK PROTECTION METHOD IN OPTICAL RING NETWORK | [2007/24] | French: | PROCEDE DE PROTECTION RAPIDE DE RESEAU BOUCLE OPTIQUE | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2007 | Translation filed | 29.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 09.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/32] | 29.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5636205 (SUZUKI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-4 * column 1, line 19 - line 45 * * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 8 * * column 5, line 29 - line 51 * * claim 5 * * figures 3,5 *; | [A]US2003031124 (CHOW TIMOTHY Y [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0009] ** claim 1 * | International search | [A]CN1505303 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]US2004179472 (KHALILZADEH FARID [US], et al) |