EP1737838 - SUBSTITUTED 4-ALKYL- AND 4-ALKANOYL-PIPERIDINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS NEUROKININ ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2008/21] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANSSENS, Frans Eduard, Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 02 /
SOMMEN, François Maria, Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 03 /
DE BOECK, B.C.A.G., Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340Beerse / BE | 04 /
LEENAERTS, Joseph E., Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Daelemans, Frank F.R., et al Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. J&J Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2007/43] |
Former [2007/01] | Van Borm, Werner August H.M. Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Patent Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Application number, filing date | 05729797.0 | 04.04.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005EP51509 | Priority number, date | EP20040101467 | 08.04.2004 Original published format: EP 04101467 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005097774 | Date: | 20.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1737838 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1737838 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/02 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
C07D409/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/12 (EP);
C07D401/02 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/01] | Extension states | AL | 08.11.2006 | BA | 08.11.2006 | HR | 08.11.2006 | LV | 08.11.2006 | MK | 08.11.2006 | YU | 08.11.2006 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE 4-ALKYL- UND 4-ALKANOYLPIPERIDINDERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS NEUROKININANTAGONISTEN | [2007/01] | English: | SUBSTITUTED 4-ALKYL- AND 4-ALKANOYL-PIPERIDINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS NEUROKININ ANTAGONISTS | [2007/01] | French: | DERIVES 4-ALKYL-ET 4-ALKANOYL-PIPERIDINES ET UTILISATIONS DE CES DERNIERS EN TANT QU'ANTAGONISTES DE LA NEUROKININE | [2007/01] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 13.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.05.2008 | CZ | 21.05.2008 | DK | 21.05.2008 | EE | 21.05.2008 | FI | 21.05.2008 | LT | 21.05.2008 | PL | 21.05.2008 | RO | 21.05.2008 | SI | 21.05.2008 | SK | 21.05.2008 | TR | 21.05.2008 | BG | 21.08.2008 | SE | 21.08.2008 | GR | 22.08.2008 | IS | 21.09.2008 | PT | 21.10.2008 | HU | 22.11.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
GR | 22.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
HU | 22.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/52] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
GR | 22.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | DK | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 21.05.2008 | |
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | FI | 21.05.2008 | |
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 21.05.2008 | |
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 21.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO9716440 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [YD] 1,8,11,13 * claim 1; tables 6,7; compounds 1-192 *; | [A]WO9724356 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO0232867 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [YD] 1,8,11,13 * claim 1 *; | [YD]WO02062784 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [YD] 1,8,11,13 * Formula IC; page 3, line 15 *; | [PA]WO2004056805 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [PA] 1 * the whole document ** compounds 1-10 * |