EP1729646 - ROTARY TRANSMITTER COMPRISING A DIELECTRIC WAVEGUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2021 | Opposition rejected | published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schleifring GmbH Am Hardtanger 10 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | [2018/21] |
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states Schleifring und Apparatebau GmbH Am Hardtanger 10 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUMME, Nils Jahnstr. 13a 82340 Feldafing / DE | 02 /
LOHR, Georg Zweigstrasse 31 82223 Eichenau / DE | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim/München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/48] | Lohr, Georg Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim / DE | ||
Former [2008/46] | Lohr, Georg Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Lohr Junkersstrasse 3 82178 Puchheim / DE | ||
Former [2006/50] | Lohr, Georg Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Lohr Hauptstrasse 40 82223 Eichenau / DE | Application number, filing date | 05730328.1 | 31.03.2005 | [2006/50] | WO2005EP03396 | Priority number, date | DE20041016525 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004016525 | DE20041031355 | 28.06.2004 Original published format: DE102004031355 | [2006/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005094687 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1729646 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1729646 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/03 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
A61B6/56 (EP,US);
A61B6/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Title | German: | DREHÜBERTRAGER MIT DIELEKTRISCHEM WELLENLEITER | [2006/50] | English: | ROTARY TRANSMITTER COMPRISING A DIELECTRIC WAVEGUIDE | [2006/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION ROTATIF À GUIDE D'ONDES DIÉLECTRIQUE | [2013/33] |
Former [2006/50] | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION ROTATIF A GUIDE D'ONDES DIELECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 20.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.03.2014
07.04.2014
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/48] |
Former [2014/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.03.2014
27.03.2014
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | 07.10.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.01.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.02.2015 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2015 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 20.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.08.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.08.2016 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 24.03.2021 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2021/22] | Appeal following opposition | 23.09.2016 | Appeal received No. T2192/16 | 23.09.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.03.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 24.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2005 | BG | 27.11.2013 | CY | 27.11.2013 | CZ | 27.11.2013 | DK | 27.11.2013 | EE | 27.11.2013 | ES | 27.11.2013 | FI | 27.11.2013 | IT | 27.11.2013 | LT | 27.11.2013 | MC | 27.11.2013 | NL | 27.11.2013 | PL | 27.11.2013 | RO | 27.11.2013 | SE | 27.11.2013 | SI | 27.11.2013 | SK | 27.11.2013 | TR | 27.11.2013 | GR | 28.02.2014 | IS | 27.03.2014 | PT | 27.03.2014 | AT | 31.03.2014 | BE | 31.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | FR | 31.03.2014 | GB | 31.03.2014 | IE | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | LU | 31.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 31.03.2005 | |
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
AT | 31.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
GB | 31.03.2014 | ||
IE | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
LU | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 27.11.2013 | |
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
AT | 31.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
GB | 31.03.2014 | ||
IE | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
LU | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | BG | 27.11.2013 | |
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
AT | 31.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
GB | 31.03.2014 | ||
IE | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
LU | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 27.11.2013 | |
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
AT | 31.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
GB | 31.03.2014 | ||
IE | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
LU | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
AT | 31.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
GB | 31.03.2014 | ||
IE | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
LU | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
GB | 31.03.2014 | ||
IE | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
LU | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
GB | 31.03.2014 | ||
IE | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
LU | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
GB | 31.03.2014 | ||
IE | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
LU | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
IE | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
LU | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 31.03.2014 | ||
LU | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 27.11.2013 | |
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 27.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4692721 (ITO YUJIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-13,16 * abstract * [Y] 14,15; | [YA]US6181766 (PEARSON JR PHIL E [US], et al) [Y] 14,15 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 14 * [A] 1-13,16; | [A]US6580853 (HARRISON DANIEL DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US6301324 (PEARSON JR PHIL E [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5530422 (HARRISON DANIEL D [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A] - MEINKE H, GUNDLACH F W, Taschenbuch der Hochfrequenztechnik S. 308-313, BERLIN, SPRINGER, (1968), XP002333224 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |