EP1758934 - COSPEPTIN, COSMEDIN AND THEIR USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University 1705 El Camino Real Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY 1705 El Camino Real Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | ||
For all designated states JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSUEH, Aaron J.W. SUMC Boswell A344 Stanford, California 94305-5317 / US | 02 /
HSU, Sheau Yu Teddy 2038 Santa Cruz Avenue Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 03 /
BARRETT, Terrance D. 1960 Misty Circle Encinitas, California 92024 / US | 04 /
MORTON, Magda F. 1750 Kettner Boulevard 408 San Diego, California 92101 / US | 05 /
PRENDERGAST, Clodagh 19 Bentley Road Prenton, CH43 5RX / GB | 06 /
SHANKLEY, Nigel P. 449 Marview Lane Solana Beach, California 92075 / US | 07 /
AVSIAN-KRETCHMER, Orna 4746 Gertrude Drive Fremont, California 94536 / US | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05730461.0 | 22.03.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005US09392 | Priority number, date | US20040555818P | 23.03.2004 Original published format: US 555818 P | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005094453 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1758934 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/18, A61Q13/00 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/06 (EP);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/10] | C07K14/705 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Extension states | AL | 23.10.2006 | BA | 23.10.2006 | HR | 23.10.2006 | LV | 23.10.2006 | MK | 23.10.2006 | YU | 23.10.2006 | Title | German: | COSPEPTIN, COSMEDIN UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | [2007/10] | English: | COSPEPTIN, COSMEDIN AND THEIR USES | [2007/10] | French: | LA COSPEPTINE, LA COSMEDINE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 25.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/13] | 12.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - PEETERS T.L., "Potential of Grehlin as a Therapeutic Approach for Gastrointestinal Motility Disorders", CURRENT OPINION IN PHARMACOLOGY, (2006), vol. 6, pages 553 - 558, XP003010061 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.coph.2006.08.005 | [A] - BRUBAKER ET AL., "Glucagon-like Peptides Regulate Cell Proliferation and Apoptosis in the Pancreas Gut, and Central Nervous System", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2004), vol. 145, no. 6, pages 2653 - 2659, XP002350954 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.2004-0015 |