EP1733354 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR EFFECTING STRAIGHT-THROUGH-PROCESSING OF TRADES OF VARIOUS FINANCIAL INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRADEWEB MARKETS LLC Harborside Financial Center 2200 Plaza Five Jersey City, NJ 07311-4993 / US | [2008/51] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Thomson Tradeweb LLC Harborside Financial Center 2200 Plaza Five Jersey City, NJ 07311 / US | ||
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states Tradeweb Group L.L.C. Harborside Financial Center 2200 Plaza Five Jersey City, NJ 07311 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOFFEY, James, Worden 30 Pembroke Road Summit, NJ 07901 / US | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05730836.3 | 25.03.2005 | [2006/51] | WO2005US10226 | Priority number, date | US20040808820 | 25.03.2004 Original published format: US 808820 | US20040556139P | 25.03.2004 Original published format: US 556139 P | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005094284 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1733354 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/00 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
G06Q40/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEWIRKUNG EINER DURCHGANGSVERARBEITUNG VON HANDELSOPERATIONEN VERSCHIEDENER FINANZINSTRUMENTE | [2006/51] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR EFFECTING STRAIGHT-THROUGH-PROCESSING OF TRADES OF VARIOUS FINANCIAL INSTRUMENTS | [2006/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE REALISATION D'UN TRAITEMENT CONTINU DE NEGOCIATIONS DE DIVERS INSTRUMENTS FINANCIERS | [2006/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - The technical aspects identified in the present application (Art. 92 EPC) are considered part of common general knowledge. Due to their notoriety no documentary evidence is found to be required. For further details see the reference below., XP002456252 [L] 1,2 | International search | [X]US2003149646 ; | [Y]US2003115131 ; | [Y]US2003088509 ; | [A]US2002143694 |