EP1745101 - POLYPROPYLENE BLENDS FOR NON-WOVEN FABRICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) 1801 Market Street Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | [2007/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCLOUGHLIN, Kimberly, M. 1529 Mountain View Drive Gibsonia, PA 15044 / US | 02 /
KIM, Sehyun 4119 Windsor Court Murrysville, PA 15668 / US | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Katzameyer, Michael V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestraße 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | Katzameyer, Michael v. Bezold & Sozien Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05731244.9 | 05.04.2005 | [2007/04] | WO2005US11823 | Priority number, date | US20040844640 | 12.05.2004 Original published format: US 844640 | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005113674 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1745101 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/12, C08L23/14, D04H3/00, D04H3/16, B32B5/26 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C08L23/14 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2929 (EP,US);
Y10T442/60 (EP,US);
Y10T442/659 (EP,US);
Y10T442/66 (EP,US);
Y10T442/68 (EP,US);
Y10T442/681 (EP,US);
Y10T442/69 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/12, C08L2666/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/14, C08L2666/06 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYPROPYLENBLENDS ZUR VERWENDUNG IN VLIESSTOFFEN | [2007/04] | English: | POLYPROPYLENE BLENDS FOR NON-WOVEN FABRICS | [2007/04] | French: | MELANGES DE POLYPROPYLENE DESTINES A DES TEXTILES NON TISSES | [2007/04] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 24.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/13] | 09.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004041299 (KIM SEHYUN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * abstract * * page 3; table 1 *; | [X]WO2004029342 (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-23 * abstract * * page 13 - page 14 *; | [X]WO2004029341 (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 5 - page 6 * |