EP1765190 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING A SURGICAL SYSTEM BASED ON A LOAD ON THE CUTTING TIP OF A HANDPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcon, Inc. Bösch 69, P.O. Box 62 6331 Hünenberg / CH | [2008/31] |
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states Alcon, Inc. Bösch 69, P.O. Box 62 6331 Hunenberg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUKHNY, Mikhail 24922 Monte Verde Drive Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | 02 /
GORDON, Raphael 4 Conservatory Drive Ladera Ranch, CA 92694 / US | 03 /
MORGAN, Michael 2855 Tabago Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US | 04 /
YADLOWSKY, Ann 3 Campanero East Irvine, CA 92620 / US | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Hanna, Peter William Derek Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | Hanna, Peter William Derek Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 05731434.6 | 21.03.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005US09274 | Priority number, date | US20040555240P | 22.03.2004 Original published format: US 555240 P | US20040818314 | 05.04.2004 Original published format: US 818314 | US20040587693P | 14.07.2004 Original published format: US 587693 P | US20050068301 | 28.02.2005 Original published format: US 68301 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005092023 | Date: | 06.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1765190 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1765190 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/007, // A61B17/32 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
A61B17/320068 (EP,US);
A61F9/00745 (EP,BR,US);
A61M3/0208 (EP,US);
A61M3/0216 (EP,US);
A61M3/022 (EP,US);
A61M3/0258 (EP,BR,US);
A61B2017/00017 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0003 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00973 (EP,US);
A61B2017/32007 (EP,US);
A61M1/77 (EP,BR,US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/13] | A61B17/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES CHIRURGISCHEN SYSTEMS AUF DER GRUNDLAGE EINER LAST AUF DER SCHNEIDSPITZE EINES HANDSTÜCKS | [2007/13] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING A SURGICAL SYSTEM BASED ON A LOAD ON THE CUTTING TIP OF A HANDPIECE | [2007/13] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DE SYSTEME CHIRURGICAL REPOSANT SUR LA CHARGE EXERCEE A L'EXTREMITE TRANCHANTE D'UNE PIECE A MAIN | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 28.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5331951 (KEPLEY KEVIN PAUL [US]) [A] 1,3,15,40,41 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 27; claim 7 *; | [A]WO0124744 (ALCON UNIVERSAL LTD [CH], et al) [A] 1-4,15,19,40,41 * page 1, lines 2-4,26-28 * * page 2, lines 10-17 * * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 24; claims 5,7,9,10 *; | [A]US6394974 (KADZIAUSKAS KENNETH E [US], et al) [A] * column 2, lines 18-23 * * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 9 * * column 8, lines 21-25 ** column 10, lines 33-58; figures 5,9,10,12; claim 6 *; | [A]WO03043550 (ADVANCED MEDICAL OPTICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1,3,15-18,41 * page 1, lines 7-12 * * page 2, lines 39-34 * * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 7 * * page 5, line 36 - page 6, line 28; figure 1 * | International search | [A]US6077285 (BOUKHNY MIKHAIL [US]); | [A]US6179805 (SUSSMAN GLENN [US], et al) |