EP1735669 - A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPROVED SPEED ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lazer Safe Pty Ltd 27 Action Road Malaga, W.A. 6090 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states Lazer Safe Pty. Ltd 27 Action Road Malaga, W.A. 6090 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STANEV, Dimitre, Stantchev 28/18 Forrest Avenue East Perth, W.A. 6004 / AU | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | HGF 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2006/52] | Ajello, Michael John Harrison Goddard Foote, Orlando House,11c Compstall Road, Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05731842.0 | 15.04.2005 | [2006/52] | WO2005AU00544 | Priority number, date | AU20040901973 | 15.04.2004 Original published format: AU 2004901973 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005101142 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1735669 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/00, G05B9/02 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
G05B9/02 (EP);
G05B19/4063 (EP);
G05B2219/15105 (EP);
G05B2219/34465 (EP);
G05B2219/34478 (EP);
G05B2219/34484 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/52] | G05B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE ARCHITKTUR MIT VERBESSERTER GESCHWINDIGKEIT | [2006/52] | English: | A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPROVED SPEED ARCHITECTURE | [2006/52] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DESTINES A UNE ARCHITECTURE DE VITESSE AMELIOREE | [2006/52] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 20.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/40] | 20.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4117317 (DOOLEY JR PHILIP G, et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 60 * * column 4, lines 7-66 ** figure 1 * | International search | [A]US6169927 ; | [A]US5923558 ; | [A]EP0304880 |