EP1755401 - DIETARY SUPPLEMENTS CONTAINING EXTRACTS OF CINNAMON AND METHODS OF USING SAME TO ENHANCE CREATINE TRANSPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IN Ingredients, Inc. 1028 Nashville Hwy Columbia, TN 38401 / US | [2017/19] |
Former [2014/49] | For all designated states IN Ingredients, Inc. 3005 Parkfield Loop S Spring Hill, TN 37174-2879 / US | ||
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states MILLER, Peter 13439 Antlers Street Broomfield CO 80020 / US | ||
For all designated states ROMERO, Timothy 201 Field End Street Ste A Sarasota FL 34240 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Peter 13439 Antlers Street Broomfield, Colorado 80020 / US | 02 /
Romero, Timothy 201 Field End Street, Ste A Sarasota, Florida 34240 / US | [2014/49] |
Former [2007/09] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Geskes, Christoph, et al Geskes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 51 06 28 50942 Köln / DE | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/33] | Geskes, Christoph, et al Geskes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gustav-Heinemann-Ufer 74b 50968 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2007/09] | Maxton Langmaack & Partner Postfach 51 08 06 50944 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 05732146.5 | 11.04.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005US12171 | Priority number, date | US20040823429 | 12.04.2004 Original published format: US 823429 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005099455 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1755401 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1755401 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A23L33/105, A23L33/17, A61K31/195, A61K36/54, A61P3/02, A61P3/10 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/195 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A23L33/175 (EP,US);
A61K36/54 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/195, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/54, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/21, A23V2250/306, A23V2200/33, A23V2200/332, A23V2250/161, A23V2250/5114, A23V2250/616 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/306, A23V2250/21 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2009/13] | A61K31/195, A23L1/305, A23L1/30, A61P3/02, A61P3/10 | ||
Former IPC [2008/03] | A61K31/195 | ||
Former IPC [2007/09] | A01N65/00, A61K36/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/47] |
Former [2007/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NAHRUNGSMITTELZUSÄTZE, DIE ZIMTEXTRAKTE ENTHALTEN, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES CREATINTRANSPORTS | [2007/09] | English: | DIETARY SUPPLEMENTS CONTAINING EXTRACTS OF CINNAMON AND METHODS OF USING SAME TO ENHANCE CREATINE TRANSPORT | [2007/09] | French: | COMPLEMENTS ALIMENTAIRES CONTENANT DES EXTRAITS DE CANNELLE ET LEURS METHODES D'UTILISATION POUR AMELIORER LE TRANSPORT DE CREATINE | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 16.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 18.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.11.2016 | CY | 23.11.2016 | DK | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | FI | 23.11.2016 | LT | 23.11.2016 | MC | 23.11.2016 | NL | 23.11.2016 | RO | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | TR | 23.11.2016 | BG | 23.02.2017 | GR | 24.02.2017 | IS | 23.03.2017 | IE | 11.04.2017 | LU | 11.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
TR | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 11.04.2017 | ||
LU | 11.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 11.04.2017 | ||
LU | 11.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 11.04.2017 | ||
LU | 11.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001008641 (KROTZER R DOUGLAS [US]) [A] 1-20* claims 1,3 *; | [X]US6485773 (MYERS BRENT RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 2, lines 25-45; claim 1 *; | [X]US2004043013 (MCCLEARY EDWARD LARRY [US]) [X] 1-20 * example 18; claim 18 * * page 1, paragraphs 2,9 * * page 14, paragraph 123 * | International search | [Y]US5900435 (MEGLASSON MARTIN D [US]); | [Y]US2001022980 (BELL STACEY J [US], et al); | [Y]US2003224062 (MILLER PETER J [US], et al); | [Y]US2004028751 (MAE TATSUMASA [JP], et al) | by applicant | US6485773 | - STENGEE ET AL., "insulin was co-infused along with creatine supplementation", AM. J. PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 275, pages E974 - 79 |