EP1754214 - HIGH EFFICENCY LOW POWER LED BACKLIGHTING SYSTEM FOR LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vert, Inc. 383 Dorchester Ave., Suite 160 Somerville, MA 02127 / US | [2007/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KVENVOLD, Anthony, Mark 41 South Shaker Road Harvard, MA 01451 / US | 02 /
HARKAVY, Brad 122 Henry Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | McKechnie, Neil Henry, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | McKechnie, Neil Henry, et al Kennedys Patent Agency Limited 185 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5QD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05732257.0 | 22.03.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005US09384 | Priority number, date | US20040555724P | 23.03.2004 Original published format: US 555724 P | US20050085677 | 21.03.2005 Original published format: US 85677 | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005094452 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1754214 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, G02F1/1335 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
G09G3/3426 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0646 (EP,US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHEFFIZIENTES LED-RÜCKBELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM MIT NIEDRIGER STROMAUFNAHME FÜR EINE FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGE | [2007/08] | English: | HIGH EFFICENCY LOW POWER LED BACKLIGHTING SYSTEM FOR LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY | [2007/08] | French: | SYSTEME DE RETROECLAIRAGE A DEL FAIBLE PUISSANCE HAUTE EFFICACITE POUR AFFICHEUR A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 02.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/13] | 09.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5724062 (HUNTER C ERIC [US]); | [A]US2002159002 (CHANG CHIN [US]); | [A]US6608614 (JOHNSON RICK J [US]); | [A]US6448951 (SAKAGUCHI YOSHITAMI [JP], et al); | [A]US6439731 (JOHNSON RICK [US], et al); | [A]US6115016 (YOSHIHARA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al); | [A]US4924215 (NELSON TERENCE J [US]) |