EP1732544 - TREATMENT OF TREMOR WITH HISTAMINE H3 INVERSE AGONISTS OR HISTAMINE H3 ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2006/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARINO, Michael, J. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
SEABROOK, Guy, R. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Man, Jocelyn, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | Man, Jocelyn, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05732633.2 | 22.03.2005 | [2006/51] | WO2005US09562 | Priority number, date | US20040556803P | 26.03.2004 Original published format: US 556803 P | US20040561188P | 09.04.2004 Original published format: US 561188 P | US20040629099P | 18.11.2004 Original published format: US 629099 P | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005097111 | Date: | 20.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1732544 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/445 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
A61K31/4172 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61P25/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/51] | A61K31/4172 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON TREMOR MIT HISTAMIN-H3-INVERSEN AGONISTEN ODER HISTAMIN-H3-ANTAGONISTEN | [2006/51] | English: | TREATMENT OF TREMOR WITH HISTAMINE H3 INVERSE AGONISTS OR HISTAMINE H3 ANTAGONISTS | [2006/51] | French: | TRAITEMENT DES TREMBLEMENTS UTILISANT DES AGONISTES INVERSES DE L'HISTAMINE H3 OU DES ANTAGONISTES DE L'HISTAMINE H3 | [2006/51] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 03.11.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5486526 (DURANT GRAHAM J [US], et al) |