EP1744669 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETECTING BLOOD FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/13] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKKERMANS, Antonius, H., M. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HEINKS, Carsten c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2019/13] |
Former [2007/04] | 01 /
AKKERMANS, Antonius, H., M. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
HEINKS, Carsten c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Bekkers, Joost J.J., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/13] |
Former [2008/25] | Bekkers, Joost J.J, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/04] | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05732776.9 | 26.04.2005 | [2007/04] | WO2005IB51356 | Priority number, date | EP20040101817 | 29.04.2004 Original published format: EP 04101817 | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005104935 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1744669 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1744669 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/026, A61B5/117 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
A61B5/0261 (EP,US);
A61B5/026 (KR);
A61B5/00 (KR);
A61B5/117 (KR);
G06V40/45 (EP,US);
A61B5/1172 (EP,US);
G06V40/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/13] |
Former [2007/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BLUTSTRÖMUNGSERFASSUNG | [2007/04] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETECTING BLOOD FLOW | [2007/04] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE DETECTION DE FLUX SANGUIN | [2007/04] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 27.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2005 | AT | 27.03.2019 | CY | 27.03.2019 | CZ | 27.03.2019 | DK | 27.03.2019 | EE | 27.03.2019 | ES | 27.03.2019 | FI | 27.03.2019 | IT | 27.03.2019 | LT | 27.03.2019 | MC | 27.03.2019 | NL | 27.03.2019 | PL | 27.03.2019 | RO | 27.03.2019 | SE | 27.03.2019 | SI | 27.03.2019 | SK | 27.03.2019 | TR | 27.03.2019 | IE | 26.04.2019 | LU | 26.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | BG | 27.06.2019 | GR | 28.06.2019 | IS | 27.07.2019 | PT | 27.07.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 27.03.2019 | |
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IE | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 26.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IE | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 26.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AT | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | CZ | 27.03.2019 | |
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 27.03.2019 | |
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 27.03.2019 | |
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.03.2019 | |
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4862894 (FUJII HITOSHI [JP]) [A] 1,16* abstract *; | [Y]US5737439 (LAPSLEY PHILIP DEAN [US], et al) [Y] 13,15 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 20 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 30 * * figure 6 *; | [XY] - OZDEMIR S K ET AL, "SELF-MIXING LASER SPECKLE VELOCIMETER FOR BLOOD FLOW MEASUREMENT", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200010), vol. 49, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9456, pages 1029 - 1034, XP000963756 [X] 1-12,14,16-18 * the whole document * [Y] 13,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/19.872925 | [X] - MEIGAS KALJU ET AL, "Self-mixing in a diode laser as a method for cardiovascular diagnostics", COMPENDEX, ENGINEERING INFORMATION, INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, (2003), Database accession no. E2003087364449, XP002331967 [X] 1-12,14,16-18 * the whole document * | [ ] - J BIOMED OPT; JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL OPTICS JANUARY 2003, (200301), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 152 - 160 [ ] * the whole document * |