EP1758481 - DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reckitt Benckiser (UK) Limited 103-105 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barraclough, Andrew Reckitt Benckiser (UK) Limited 103-105 Bath Road, Slough Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB | 02 /
Dibnah, Carl 5 Navigation Way, Victoria Dock Hull HU9 1SW / GB | 03 /
Wu, Michael Travelers Hotel, Luwu Seelion, Taibao Road Humen, Humen Yown, Dongguan 523900 / CN | [2008/28] |
Former [2007/10] | 01 /
Barraclough, Andrew Reckitt Benckiser (UK) Limited 103-105 Bath Road, Slough Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB | ||
02 /
Dibnah, Carl 5 Navigation Way, Victoria Dock Hull HU9 1SW / GB | |||
03 /
Wu, Michael PanYu Town, HuNan New City 9-605 GuangZhou City, GuangDong Province / CN | Representative(s) | Cawdell, Karen Teresa, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Cawdell, Karen Teresa, et al Reckitt Benckiser plc Legal Department-Patents Group Dansom Lane GB-Hull HU8 7DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 05732869.2 | 06.04.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005GB01335 | Priority number, date | GB20040007965 | 08.04.2004 Original published format: GB 0407965 | GB20040013670 | 18.06.2004 Original published format: GB 0413670 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005096879 | Date: | 20.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1758481 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1758481 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A45D27/44, A45D26/00 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
A45D27/44 (EP,US);
A45D26/00 (EP,US);
A45D34/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2007/10] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD | [2007/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 13.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.07.2008 | BE | 09.07.2008 | CY | 09.07.2008 | CZ | 09.07.2008 | DK | 09.07.2008 | EE | 09.07.2008 | FI | 09.07.2008 | LT | 09.07.2008 | NL | 09.07.2008 | RO | 09.07.2008 | SI | 09.07.2008 | SK | 09.07.2008 | BG | 09.10.2008 | SE | 09.10.2008 | GR | 10.10.2008 | IS | 09.11.2008 | PT | 09.12.2008 | HU | 10.01.2009 | IE | 06.04.2009 | LU | 06.04.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
GR | 10.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
HU | 10.01.2009 | ||
IE | 06.04.2009 | ||
LU | 06.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
GR | 10.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
IE | 06.04.2009 | ||
LU | 06.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
GR | 10.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
IE | 06.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
IE | 06.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 09.07.2008 | |
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2384704 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [X]DE20311422U (RECKITT BENCKISER UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-11,13 * the whole document * |