EP1720496 - GASTRIC IMPLANT FOR TREATING OBESITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dedienne Sante Mas des Cavaliers 217 Rue Nungesser 34130 Mauguio / FR | [2006/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CADY, Jean 9 rue Murillo F-75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
DE SEGUIN DES HONS, Charles Mas de Piecourt, Saint Julien de la Nef 30440 Sumene / FR | 03 /
FABRE, Jean-Michel 12 rue du Roussillon F-34170 Castelnau Le Lez / FR | 04 /
FOURTANIER, Gilles 35 rue Maran F-31400 Toulouse / FR | 05 /
DOMERGUE, Jacques Louis Hubert 65 impasse du Muscadet F-34090 Montpellier / FR | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Jeannet, Olivier JEANNET & Associés 26 Quai Claude Bernard 69007 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Jeannet, Olivier Cabinet Jeannet 40 rue Raulin 69007 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 05733028.4 | 03.03.2005 | [2006/46] | WO2005FR00508 | Priority number, date | FR20040002249 | 04.03.2004 Original published format: FR 0402249 | [2006/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005087146 | Date: | 22.09.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1720496 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/00, A61F2/00, A61B17/12 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
A61F5/0066 (EP);
A61F5/0056 (EP);
A61B17/135 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGENIMPLANTAT ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ADIPOSITAS | [2006/46] | English: | GASTRIC IMPLANT FOR TREATING OBESITY | [2006/46] | French: | IMPLANT GASTRIQUE DE TRAITEMENT DE L OBESITE | [2006/46] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/45] | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9427504 (INAMED DEV CO [US]) [Y] 1-5,7 * abstract *; | [Y]FR2827756 (RAT PATRICK [FR]) [Y] 1-4,7 * page 6 - page 10; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]WO8604498 (ASTRA MEDITEC AB [SE]) [Y] 5 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,6-8; | [A]US5527355 (AHN SAM S [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 15 - line 40 *; | [A]US4706914 (GROUND DAMON R [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9427504 | WO8604498 | FR2827756 | US5527355 |