EP1726056 - FUEL-CELL INSTALLATION, METHOD FOR ACTIVATING AND DEACTIVATING SAID INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viessmann Werke GmbH & Co. KG Viessmannstrasse 1 35107 Allendorf / DE | For all designated states elcomax membranes GmbH Bayerwaldstrasse 5 81737 München / DE | [2009/50] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Viessmann Werke GmbH & Co. KG Viessmannstrasse 1 35107 Allendorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states Viessmann Werke GmbH & Co. KG Viessmannstrasse 1 35107 Allendorf / DE | ||
For all designated states Sartorius Stedim Biotech GmbH August-Spindler-Strasse 11 37079 Göttingen / DE | |||
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states Viessmann Werke GmbH & Co. KG Viessmannstrasse 1 35107 Allendorf / DE | ||
For all designated states SARTORIUS AG Weender Landstrasse 94-108 37075 Göttingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRITZ, Peter Robinienstrasse 59 17033 Neubrandenburg / DE | 02 /
HEIKRODT, Klaus Ederstrasse 9 35108 Allendorf / DE | 03 /
MELZNER, Dieter Kreuzbergring 87 37075 Goettingen / DE | 04 /
REICHE, Annette Dawesbreite 7 37075 Goettingen / DE | [2007/30] |
Former [2007/02] | 01 /
BRITZ, Peter Kirchsteig 6A 85658 Egmating / DE | ||
02 /
HEIKRODT, Klaus Ederstrasse 9 35108 Allendorf / DE | |||
03 /
MELZNER, Dieter Kreuzbergring 87 37075 Goettingen / DE | |||
04 /
REICHE, Annette Dawesbreite 7 37075 Goettingen / DE | |||
Former [2006/48] | 01 /
BRITZ, Peter Keltenring 30 85658 Egmating / DE | ||
02 /
HEIKRODT, Klaus Ederstrasse 9 35108 Allendorf / DE | |||
03 /
MELZNER, Dieter Kreuzbergring 87 37075 Goettingen / DE | |||
04 /
REICHE, Annette Dawesbreite 7 37075 Goettingen / DE | Representative(s) | Wolf, Michael, et al An der Mainbrücke 16 63456 Hanau / DE | [2008/19] |
Former [2006/48] | Wolf, Michael An der Mainbrücke 16 D-63456 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 05733822.0 | 16.03.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005DE00489 | Priority number, date | DE20041013337 | 17.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004013337 | [2006/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005091411 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1726056 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1726056 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/06 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
H01M8/04022 (EP,US);
H01M8/04007 (EP,US);
H01M8/04223 (EP);
H01M8/04225 (EP,US);
H01M8/04228 (EP,US);
H01M8/04302 (EP,US);
H01M8/04303 (EP,US);
H01M8/0618 (EP,US);
H01M8/0662 (EP,US);
H01M8/0668 (EP,US);
H01M8/241 (EP,US);
H01M8/2457 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENANLAGE, VERFAHREN ZUM STARTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABSCHALTEN DIESER ANLAGE | [2006/48] | English: | FUEL-CELL INSTALLATION, METHOD FOR ACTIVATING AND DEACTIVATING SAID INSTALLATION | [2006/48] | French: | INSTALLATION A PILES A COMBUSTIBLE, PROCEDE POUR METTRE EN ROUTE ET PROCEDE POUR ARRETER CETTE INSTALLATION | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 13.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.08.2009 | CZ | 12.08.2009 | EE | 12.08.2009 | FI | 12.08.2009 | IE | 12.08.2009 | LT | 12.08.2009 | RO | 12.08.2009 | SE | 12.08.2009 | SI | 12.08.2009 | SK | 12.08.2009 | BG | 12.11.2009 | GR | 13.11.2009 | IS | 12.12.2009 | PT | 12.12.2009 | HU | 13.02.2010 | LU | 16.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
HU | 13.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | CZ | 12.08.2009 | |
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 12.08.2009 | |
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | EE | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | FI | 12.08.2009 | |
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | FI | 12.08.2009 | |
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5525436 (SAVINELL ROBERT F [US], et al) [Y] 3 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2003008184 (BALLANTINE ARNE W [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0029] - [0032] - [0063] *; | [DA]DE10132064 (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE]) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003039871 (CHRISTEN ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 5-8 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0014] - [0018] *; | [DY]DE10160463 (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE]) [DY] 1-4 * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [DA]DE10209681 (EMITEC EMISSIONSTECHNOLOGIE [DE]) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE10155543 (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE10235430 (TRUMA GERAETETECHNIK GMBH & CO [DE]) [DA] 1-8* the whole document * |