EP1740432 - MODEL-BASED CONTROL FOR TORQUE BIASING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna Powertrain USA, Inc. 1775 Research Drive Troy, MI 48083 / US | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, William E. 137 Green Acres Drive Liverpool, New York 13090 / US | 02 /
BANSBACH, Eric A. 5543 Sandstone Way Fayetteville, New York 13066 / US | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Fries, Oliver Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Fries, Oliver Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Fries, Oliver Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05733850.1 | 12.04.2005 | [2007/02] | WO2005US12024 | Priority number, date | US20040827550 | 19.04.2004 Original published format: US 827550 | [2007/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005105510 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1740432 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1740432 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/02, F16H59/64, F16D48/06 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
F16D48/06 (EP,US);
B60K23/0808 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3165 (EP,US);
F16D2500/50287 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70404 (EP,US);
F16D2500/708 (EP,US);
F16D2500/7082 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/02] | B60W10/02, F16H59/64 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [2007/30] |
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUF EINEM MODELL BASIERENDE STEUERUNG FÜR EIN DREHMOMENTVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM | [2007/02] | English: | MODEL-BASED CONTROL FOR TORQUE BIASING SYSTEM | [2007/02] | French: | COMMANDE BASEE SUR UN MODELE, POUR SYSTEME D'IMPOSITION DE COUPLE | [2007/02] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 16.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.2012 | FR | 30.04.2012 | [2013/13] |
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0390197 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,10,17,27* figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5199325 (REUTER DAVID C [US], et al) [A] 1,10,17,27 * figure - *; | [I]US2002002433 (MATSUNO KOJI [JP]) [I] 1-3,6,27-29,32 * figures 1,2 *; | [I]US2003134713 (SENGER KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al) [I] 1-3,5,6,9-11,16,27-29,31,32,34,35 * paragraphs [0044] , [0062]; figure -; claims 1-6 *; | [I]US6697725 (WILLIAMS CAMERON PHILLIP [US]) [I] 1-3,6,27-29,32 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1403124 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,10,17,27 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [XP]WO2005009776 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al) [XP] 1,3 * page 6; claim 1 * | International search | [Y]US4789040 (MORISHITA MITSUHARU [JP], et al); | [X]US6151544 (AMISANO FABRIZIO [IT], et al); | [X]US6716136 (HROVAT DAVORIN DAVID [US], et al); | [XP]US6808052 (KIRKWOOD MALCOLM E [US], et al) |