EP1636917 - BALANCED TRANSMITTING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Akihiro 2-33-15, Keyakidai, Kiyamacho Miyaki-gun, Saga 841-0205 / JP | 02 /
ICHIHARA, Fumio 1-130, Katanawa, Nakagawamachi Chikushi-gun, Fukuoka 811-1201 / JP | 03 /
HANADA, Tsunehiro 1-34-36, Kotabe, Sawara-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-0032 / JP | 04 /
OISHI, Mutsuhiko 1620-201, Tateiwa, Izuka-shi Fukuoka 820-0003 / JP | 05 /
WAKISAKA, Toshiyuki 441-1-305, Ikawa, Izuka-shi Fukuoka 820-0054 / JP | 06 /
MAKI, Masahiro 810-26-209, Befu, Shimemachi Kasuya-gun, Fukuoka 811-2505 / JP | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05734275.0 | 15.04.2005 | [2006/12] | WO2005JP07656 | Priority number, date | JP20040121377 | 16.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004121377 | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005101684 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1636917 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1636917 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/56, H04B3/30 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
H04B3/30 (EP,US);
H04B3/54 (EP,US);
H04B3/56 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5483 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5491 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYMMETRISCHE SENDEVORRICHTUNG | [2006/12] | English: | BALANCED TRANSMITTING APPARATUS | [2006/12] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION EQUILIBRE | [2006/12] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 10.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.03.2011 | BE | 09.03.2011 | CY | 09.03.2011 | CZ | 09.03.2011 | DK | 09.03.2011 | EE | 09.03.2011 | FI | 09.03.2011 | HU | 09.03.2011 | IT | 09.03.2011 | LT | 09.03.2011 | NL | 09.03.2011 | PL | 09.03.2011 | RO | 09.03.2011 | SE | 09.03.2011 | SI | 09.03.2011 | SK | 09.03.2011 | TR | 09.03.2011 | IE | 15.04.2011 | LU | 15.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | BG | 09.06.2011 | GB | 09.06.2011 | GR | 10.06.2011 | ES | 20.06.2011 | IS | 09.07.2011 | PT | 11.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
TR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 15.04.2011 | ||
LU | 15.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GB | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 15.04.2011 | ||
LU | 15.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GB | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 15.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GB | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 15.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 15.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 09.03.2011 | |
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3237919 (KABELMETAL ELECTRO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-17,24,25 * page 3, line 4 - line 21 *; | [X]WO9302518 (AFFERENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,3,24,25* page 20, line 26 - page 21, line 32 * |