EP1742297 - COLLAPSABLE PORTABLE WIRELESS UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industries Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Y c/o Matsushita Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. IPROC-IP Dev. Ctr. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 3-7-1 Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Y. c/o Matsushita Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. IPROC-IP Dev. Ctr. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 3-7-1 Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
KOYANAGI, Y c/o Matsushita Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. IPROC-IP Dev. Ctr. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 3-7-1 Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 04 /
KATAYAMA, H c/o Matsushita Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. IPROC-IP Dev. Ctr. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 3-7-1 Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 05 /
NISHIKIDO, T c/o Matsushita Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. IPROC-IP Dev. Ctr. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 3-7-1 Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05734607.4 | 25.04.2005 | [2007/02] | WO2005JP07850 | Priority number, date | JP20040130328 | 26.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004130328 | [2007/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005104299 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1742297 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q13/08, H01Q21/24, H04M1/02 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
H01Q9/0435 (EP,US);
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q9/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/31] |
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOLLABIERBARE TRAGBARE DRAHTLOSE EINHEIT | [2007/02] | English: | COLLAPSABLE PORTABLE WIRELESS UNIT | [2007/02] | French: | UNITE SANS FIL PORTABLE PLIANTE | [2007/02] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2006 | Translation filed | 25.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 23.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/15] | 27.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]JP2000183635 (NAOE HIROSHI) [DX] 4 * paragraph [0006]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 1,2; | [DXY]JP2000353911 (NAOE HIROSHI) [DX] 4 * paragraph [0009]; figures 9-11; claim 1 * [Y] 1,2; | [Y]US6380896 (BERGER H STEPHEN [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1383200 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2000183635 (NAOE HIROSHI); | [Y]JP2000353911 (NAOE HIROSHI); | [Y]JP2001230623 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) |