EP1760152 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING DIPEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Shin-ichi c/o Technical res. lab 1-1, Kyowa-cho, Hofu-shi Yamaguchi 747-8522 / JP | 02 /
TABATA, Kazuhiko c/o BioFrontier Lab. 6-6, Asahi-machi 3-chome, Machida-shi Tokyo 194-8533 / JP | 03 /
NOGUCHI, Ayako c/o Head Office, Kyowa Hakko Kogyo 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | 04 /
ADACHI, Yugo c/o Technical res. lab. 1-1, Kyowa-cho, Hofu-shi Yamaguchi 747-8522 / JP | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/10] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05734655.3 | 21.04.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005JP07626 | Priority number, date | JP20040125486 | 21.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004125486 | [2007/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005103260 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1760152 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/52, C12N1/21, C12N9/00, C12P21/02 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
C07K5/06043 (EP,US);
C07K5/06026 (EP,US);
C07K5/06078 (EP,US);
C07K5/12 (EP,US);
C12N9/00 (EP,US);
C12N9/93 (EP,US);
C12P21/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIPEPTIDHERSTELLUNG | [2007/10] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING DIPEPTIDE | [2007/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ SERVANT À PRODUIRE UN DIPEPTIDE | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2006 | Translation filed | 21.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 25.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/38] | 28.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0058478 (HOLLAND SWEETENER CO [NL], et al) [X] 1-20 * claim 1 *; | [E]EP1616963 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [E] 1-20* sequences 47, 48 *; | [X] - TUZUN ISIL ET AL, "2-Amino-N-(2-furylmethyl)propanamide as a novel alanylglycine equivalent synthesized by bacilysin synthetase.", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, (20031008), vol. 33, no. 5, ISSN 0141-0229, pages 725 - 728, XP002362113 [X] 1-20 * page 726, column L; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0141-0229(03)00209-6 | [X] - ZAWADZKE L E ET AL, "Existence of two D-alanine ligases in Escherichia coli: cloning and sequencing of the ddlA gene and purification and characterization of the DdlA and DdlB enzymes", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA, US, (1991), vol. 30, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 1673 - 1682, XP002998304 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00220a033 | [X] - NEUHAUS F C, "The enzymatic synthesis of D-alanyl-D-alanine. I. Purification and properties of D-alanyl-D-alanine synthetase.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY MAR 1962, (196203), vol. 237, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 778 - 786, XP002437387 [X] 1-20 * page 779, column L; table 1 * | [X] - STENESH J J ET AL, "Carnosine-anserine synthetase of muscle. 4. Partial purification of the enzyme and further studies of beta-alanyl peptide synthesis.", THE BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL DEC 1960, (196012), vol. 77, no. 3, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 575 - 581, XP002437388 [X] 1-20 * page 576, column L * | [X] - STEIN C ET AL, "An in vitro characterization of [gamma]-glutamylhistamine synthetase: A novel enzyme catalyzing histamine metabolism in the central nervous system of the marine mollusk, Aplysia californica", JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY 1982 UNITED KINGDOM, (1982), vol. 38, no. 1, pages 204 - 214, XP009085180 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1471-4159.1982.tb10873.x | International search | [X]WO2004000879 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al); | [X] - LAUTRU S. ET AL, "The albonoursin gene Cluster of S noursei biosynthesis of diketopiperazine metabolites independent of nonribosomal peptide synthetases.", CHEM BIOL., (2002), vol. 9, no. 12, pages 1355 - 1364, XP002242438 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-5521(02)00285-5 | [Y] - KANZAKI H. ET AL, "Enzymatic conversion of cyclic dipeptides to dehydro derivatives that inhibit cell division.", J BIOSCI BIOENG., (2000), vol. 90, no. 1, pages 86 - 89, XP002242437 | [A] - KANZAKI H.ET AL, "Effective production of dehydro cyclic dipeptide albonoursin exhibiting pronuclear fusion inhibitory activity. I. Taxonomy and fermentation.", J ANTIBIOT., (1999), vol. 52, no. 11, pages 1017 - 1022, XP002934394 | [A] - KANZAKI H. ET AL, "Biosynthetic intermediates of the tetradehydro cyclic dipeptide albonoursin produced by Streptomyces albulus KO-23.", J ANTIBIOT., (2000), vol. 53, no. 11, pages 1257 - 1264, XP001149049 |