EP1739065 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING POROUS HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE AND POROUS HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIMOTO, Kenji, NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi, 4678530 / JP | [2011/40] |
Former [2007/01] | 01 /
MORIMOTO, Kenji, NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi, 4678530 / JP | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05734731.2 | 21.04.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005JP07605 | Priority number, date | JP20040126264 | 22.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004126264 | [2007/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005102963 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1739065 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1739065 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C04B38/00, B01D39/20 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
B01D39/2079 (EP,US);
C04B38/00 (KR);
B01D39/20 (KR);
B01D39/2037 (EP,US);
C04B26/00 (KR);
C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0006, C04B35/515 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, PL [2007/31] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PORÖSEN WABENSTRUKTUR UND PORÖSE WABENSTRUKTUR | [2007/01] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING POROUS HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE AND POROUS HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE | [2007/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE STRUCTURE ALVÉOLAIRE POREUSE ET STRUCTURE ALVÉOLAIRE POREUSE | [2007/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2006 | Translation filed | 09.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 23.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003148063 (MORIMOTO KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9* examples 4,6-9 * | International search | [Y]JPS58213691 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG); | [Y]JPS61168582 (KOHJIN CO); | [Y]JPH04108676 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JPH05213681 (KAWATA MFG, et al); | [Y]JPH06100381 (ENGELHARD CORP); | [Y]JPH06234567 (NITTETSU MINING CO LTD); | [Y]JPH08245279 (CORNING INC); | [A]JPH08259344 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JP2000109374 (CORNING INC); | [X]JP2003010617 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2003146763 (CORNING INC); | [A]JP2003154224 (CORNING INC); | [Y]JP2003292388 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [Y]JP2003342076 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) |