EP1740776 - BOTTOM SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mellegård & Naij AB Kåsatorpsvägen 7 541 34 Skövde / SE | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELLEGARD, Per Karl Magnussons väg 7 S-541 47 Skövde / SE | 02 /
NAIJ, Stefan Stens väg 3 S-430 31 Asa / SE | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Vink, Charlotta, et al AWAPATENT AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/02] | Kraenzmer, Martin Awapatent AB, Patent Department, P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 05734883.1 | 14.04.2005 | [2007/02] | WO2005SE00533 | Priority number, date | SE20040001062 | 26.04.2004 Original published format: SE 0401062 | [2007/02] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005103390 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1740776 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1740776 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E02B5/08, E02B8/02 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
E02B8/026 (EP,US);
E02B8/023 (SE)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BODENDICHTUNG | [2007/02] | English: | BOTTOM SEAL | [2007/02] | French: | JOINT D'ETANCHEITE DE FOND | [2007/02] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 03.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.04.2010 | BE | 07.04.2010 | CZ | 07.04.2010 | EE | 07.04.2010 | FI | 07.04.2010 | LT | 07.04.2010 | RO | 07.04.2010 | SE | 07.04.2010 | SI | 07.04.2010 | SK | 07.04.2010 | IE | 14.04.2010 | LU | 14.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | CY | 05.05.2010 | BG | 07.07.2010 | GR | 08.07.2010 | IS | 07.08.2010 | PT | 09.08.2010 | HU | 08.10.2010 | [2016/07] |
Former [2014/20] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LU | 14.04.2010 | ||
TR | 14.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
HU | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LU | 14.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
HU | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BE | 07.04.2010 | ||
BG | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LU | 14.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
HU | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BE | 07.04.2010 | ||
BG | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
HU | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BE | 07.04.2010 | ||
BG | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | SI | 07.04.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]SE461284 (WALLANDER HYDROPRESS CO AB [SE]); | [A]EP0484724 (MEURER GERD GMBH [DE]); | [A]SE505169 (HP WASTE WATER MANAGEMENT AB [SE]); | [A]WO9942668 (MELLEGARD VA MASKINER AB [SE], et al) |