EP1765584 - SUPPORT APPARATUS FOR EMBOSSING ROLLS AND METHOD FOR THE REPLACEMENT OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Futura S.p.A. Via di Sottopoggio 1/X 55060 Capannori (LU), Fraz. Guamo / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states Futura S.p.A Via di Sottopoggio 1/X 55060 Capannori (LU) Fraz. Guamo / IT | ||
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states Futura S.p.A Via Per Coselli, 9/9A 55060 Badia a Cantignano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CATELLI, Paolo Via delle Ville I, 697 55100 Lucca / IT | [2007/51] |
Former [2007/13] | 01 /
CATELLI, Paolo Via delle Ville I, 697 I-55100 Lucca / IT | Representative(s) | Strasser, Wolfgang Patentanwälte Strohschänk, Uri, Strasser & Keilitz Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 14 85521 Ottobrunn-Riemerling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Strasser, Wolfgang Patentanwälte Strohschänk, Uri, Strasser & Keilitz Rosenheimer Landstrasse 87 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | ||
Former [2007/13] | Strasser, Wolfgang Innere-Wiener Strasse 8 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05734967.2 | 19.04.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005IT00222 | Priority number, date | IT2004FI00139 | 18.06.2004 Original published format: IT FI20040139 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005123374 | Date: | 29.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1765584 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1765584 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B31F1/07 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
B31F1/07 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0753 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0776 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0782 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0787 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4973 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STÜTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR PRÄGEWALZEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN AUSTAUSCH | [2007/13] | English: | SUPPORT APPARATUS FOR EMBOSSING ROLLS AND METHOD FOR THE REPLACEMENT OF THE SAME | [2007/13] | French: | APPAREIL SUPPORT DESTINE A DES ROULEAUX DE GAUFRAGE ET PROCEDE DE REMPLACEMENT DE CELUI-CI | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 02.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.12.2007 | BE | 19.12.2007 | CH | 19.12.2007 | CY | 19.12.2007 | CZ | 19.12.2007 | DK | 19.12.2007 | EE | 19.12.2007 | LI | 19.12.2007 | LT | 19.12.2007 | NL | 19.12.2007 | PL | 19.12.2007 | RO | 19.12.2007 | SI | 19.12.2007 | SK | 19.12.2007 | BG | 19.03.2008 | GR | 20.03.2008 | IS | 19.04.2008 | LU | 19.04.2008 | IE | 21.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | PT | 19.05.2008 | HU | 20.06.2008 | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/33] | AT | 19.12.2007 | |
BE | 19.12.2007 | ||
CH | 19.12.2007 | ||
CY | 19.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LI | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
LU | 19.04.2008 | ||
IE | 21.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 19.12.2007 | |
BE | 19.12.2007 | ||
CH | 19.12.2007 | ||
CY | 19.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LI | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
IE | 21.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 19.12.2007 | |
BE | 19.12.2007 | ||
CH | 19.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LI | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
IE | 21.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 19.12.2007 | |
BE | 19.12.2007 | ||
CH | 19.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LI | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 19.12.2007 | |
BE | 19.12.2007 | ||
CH | 19.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
LI | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 19.12.2007 | |
BE | 19.12.2007 | ||
CH | 19.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
LI | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 19.12.2007 | |
BE | 19.12.2007 | ||
CH | 19.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
LI | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 19.12.2007 | |
BE | 19.12.2007 | ||
CH | 19.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
LI | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 19.12.2007 | |
CH | 19.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
LI | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 19.12.2007 | |
CH | 19.12.2007 | ||
LI | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/27] | CH | 19.12.2007 | |
LI | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 19.12.2007 | |
LI | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 19.12.2007 | |
LI | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1922274 (ALBERT SCHNELLPRESSEN) [A] 1,2,8,9 * page 2, paragraph 4; figure 1 *; | [A]US5092240 (SCHUMACHER THOMAS H [US]) [A] 4,6 * column 2, line 48 - line 64; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0492102 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [Y] 1-6,8-10 * column 3, line 43 - line 48; figures 1,3,9 * * column 4, line 51 - line 57 *; | [A]US5647275 (LUPA JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 4-6 * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 15; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9941064 (PERINI FABIO SPA [IT], et al) [A] 7,11* page 7, line 21 - line 24; figures 1,5 *; | [YA]US6176287 (WEBER MANFRED [FR]) [Y] 1-6,8-10 * column 3, line 64 - column 5, line 19; figures 1-6 * [A] 7,11-14 |