EP1738515 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR ONLINE TRANSACTION PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states First Data Corporation Suite M21A2, 12500 East Bedford Avenue Englewood, CO 80112-5939 / US | [2007/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANFLEET, Steven, L. 160 Range Road Southport, Connecticut 06890 / US | 02 /
BENTON, Blake 1321 South 169th Avenue Omaha, Nebraska 68130 / US | 03 /
BYRNE, Matthew, T. 906 Killarney Drive Papillion, Nebraska 68046 / US | 04 /
HORTON, Timothy 1020 East Cary Street Papillion, Nebraska 68046 / US | 05 /
MASCAVAGE, John, J. 701 Harvard Road San Mateo, California 94402 / US | 06 /
MOLLETT, Cassandra, J. 8426 East Shetland Trail Scottsdale, Arizona 85258 / US | 07 /
NELSON, Susan, M. 4916 North 136 Street Omaha, Nebraska 68164 / US | 08 /
ROGERS, Suzanne 19301 Camden Avenue Elkhorn, Nebraska 68022 / US | 09 /
SARGENT, Rhonda, D. 2415 Bexford View Cumming, Georgia 30041 / US | 10 /
STIVERS, Martin 313 Hillway, P.O. Box 91 Glenwood, Iowa 51534 / US | 11 /
TRAINOR, Gary, J. 245 Southern Hills Drive Duluth, Georgia 30097 / US | 12 /
WEICHERT, Margaret 2933 Heathmoor Charlotte, North Carolina 28211 / US | 13 /
WING, Diane 1024 Huntington Road East Lansing, Michigan 48823 / US | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St Ives Cambridge PE27 5PD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05735401.1 | 14.04.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005US12756 | Priority number, date | US20040825971 | 16.04.2004 Original published format: US 825971 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005107135 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1738515 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3674 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0242 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
H04L63/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR ONLINE-TRANSAKTIONSVERARBEITUNG | [2007/01] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR ONLINE TRANSACTION PROCESSING | [2007/01] | French: | PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES DE TRAITEMENT DE TRANSACTIONS EN LIGNE | [2007/01] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 05.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 05.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB2333878 (CITIBANK NA [US]) [I] 1-25 * abstract * * page 11, line 1 - page 12, line 34 * * page 14, line 12 - page 22, line 20 *; | [A]EP0982674 (CITIBANK NA [US]) [A] 1-25 * abstract ** paragraphs [0023] - [0040] *; | [I]US6247129 (KEATHLEY KIMBERLY ANN [US], et al) [I] 1-25 * abstract * * column 1, lines 10-14 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 19 * * column 4, lines 12-23 * * column 5, line 50 - column 8, line 67 *; | [A]US2004064405 (WEICHERT MARGARET MORGAN [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] - [0042] * | International search | [X]US6609113 (O'LEARY DENIS [US], et al); | [Y]US2001054003 (CHIEN EMILY [US], et al); | [A]US6173272 (THOMAS GEORGE F [US], et al); | [A]US2002111907 (LING MARVIN T [US]) |