EP1751805 - ARTIFICIAL AMORPHOUS SEMICONDUCTORS AND APPLICATIONS TO SOLAR CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEWSOUTH INNOVATIONS PTY LIMITED Rupert Myers Building Level 2, Gate 14, Barker Street, UNSW Sydney, NSW 2052 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states NEWSOUTH INNOVATIONS PTY LIMITED Rupert Myers Building Level 2, Gate 14, Barker Street, UNSW Sydney, NSW 2052 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREEN, Martin Andrew, Photovoltaics Spe. Res. C. School of Electronics, UNSW Sydney, NSW 2052 / AU | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Maiwald, Walter Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Maiwald, Walter Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/07] | Maiwald, Walter Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 D-80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05735944.0 | 29.04.2005 | [2007/07] | WO2005AU00614 | Priority number, date | AU20040902299 | 30.04.2004 Original published format: AU 2004902299 | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005106966 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1751805 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 10.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0352, H01L29/12, H01L21/20, H01L31/0224, H01L31/18, H01L31/068, H01L31/0384 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
H01L31/035236 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01L29/127 (EP,US);
H01L31/022425 (EP,US);
H01L31/0384 (EP,US);
H01L31/0687 (EP,US);
H01L31/1804 (EP,US);
H01L31/1812 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/07] | H01L31/0264, H01L29/15, H01L21/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜNSTLICHE AMORPHE HALBLEITER UND ANWENDUNGEN AUF SOLARZELLEN | [2007/07] | English: | ARTIFICIAL AMORPHOUS SEMICONDUCTORS AND APPLICATIONS TO SOLAR CELLS | [2007/07] | French: | SEMI-CONDUCTEURS AMORPHES ARTIFICIELS ET APPLICATIONS A DES CELLULES SOLAIRES | [2007/07] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 22.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/43] | 14.06.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1134799 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [X] 9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0038] * [A] 1-8; | [XY]DE10104193 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [X] 1,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0044] , [0045] * [Y] 2-8,11-16; | [A]WO03034113 (NKT RES & INNOVATION AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [Y] - DAS B ET AL, "LOW-COST, HIGH EFFICIENCY MULTIJUNCTION PHOTOVOLTAIC CELLS BASED ONSEMICONDUCTOR NANOSTRUCTURES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM PHOTOVOLTAICS FOR THE 21ST CENTURY. SEATTLE, WA, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY PROCEEDINGS VOL. 99-11, PENNINGTON,NJ : ELECTROCHEMICAL SOC, US, MEETING 195, (199905), ISBN 1-56677-233-8, pages 97 - 102, XP000994067 [Y] 2-8,11-16 * the whole document * | [X] - MAX-PLANCK-GESELLSCHAFT, "Technologischer Durchbruch für die Silizium-Photonik", PRESSEINFORMATION, (20030721), URL: http://www.maxplanck.de/bilderBerichteDokumente/dokumentation/pressemitteilungen/2003/pressemitteilung200307211/index.html, (20070503), XP002432608 [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * | [X] - TSYBESKOV L ET AL, "Nanocrystalline-silicon superlattice produced by controlled recrystallization", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19980105), vol. 72, no. 1, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 43 - 45, XP012019733 [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.120640 | [X] - ZACHARIAS M ET AL, "Size-controlled highly luminescent silicon nanocrystals: A SiO/SiO2 superlattice approach", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20020128), vol. 80, no. 4, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 661 - 663, XP012031410 [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1433906 | [X] - YI L X ET AL, "Si rings, Si clusters, and Si nanocrystals-different states of ultrathin SiOx layers", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20021125), vol. 81, no. 22, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 4248 - 4250, XP012032658 [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1525051 | [X] - HIRANO Y ET AL, "Photoconductive properties of nanometer-sized Si dot multilayers", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20011001), vol. 79, no. 14, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 2255 - 2257, XP012029054 [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1408600 | [X] - KONLE J ET AL, "Enhanced performance of silicon based photodetectors using silicon/germanium nanostructures", SOLID STATE ELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (200111), vol. 45, no. 11, ISSN 0038-1101, pages 1921 - 1925, XP004308900 [X] 9,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0038-1101(01)00234-9 | [A] - GUHA S, "Material and device consideration for high efficiency a-Si alloy-based multijunction cells", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING COMPANY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (199605), vol. 198-200, ISSN 0022-3093, pages 1076 - 1080, XP004243196 [A] 3-8,11,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-3093(96)00047-6 | [A] - ZACHARIAS M ET AL, "FORMATION OF GE NANOCRYSTALS IN AMORPHOUS GEOX AND SIGEOX ALLOY FILMS", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (19960515), vol. 278, no. 1/2, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 32 - 36, XP000637214 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(95)08133-X | [A] - ZACHARIAS M ET AL, "A comparative study of Ge nanocrystals in SixGeyOz alloys and SiOx/GeOy multilayers", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19970301), vol. 81, no. 5, ISSN 0021-8979, page 2384, XP012041673 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.364242 | [A] - LIANG Y ET AL, "THE MECHANISM OF FORMATION AND PHOTOLUMINESCENCE OF SI QUANTUM DOTS EMBEDDED IN AMORPHOUS SIO2 MATRIX", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (20000508), vol. 4086, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 174 - 177, XP001069758 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.408423 | International search | [XP]US2004234745 (CHANG TING-CHANG [TW], et al); | [XP]US2004219750 (CHANG TING-CHANG [TW], et al); | [X]US2004126582 (NG KWOK [US], et al); | [XP]US2004092125 (KIM YOUNG-HO [KR], et al); | [X]US2002153522 (PARK NAE MAN [KR], et al); | [X]WO9950916 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) | Examination | - MARK WANLASS ET AL, "Monolithic, Ultra-Thin GaInP/GaAs/GaInAs Tandem Solar Cells", PHOTOVOLTAIC ENERGY CONVERSION, CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 2006 IEEE 4TH WORLD CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20060501), pages 729 - 732, XP031007408 |