EP1741654 - PARALLEL-FOLDING DEVICE FOR FOLDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Komori Corporation 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-0001 / JP | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Takao, c/o KOMORI CORPORATION Sekiyado Plant; 210, Kirigasaku Noda-shi, Chiba 2700213 / JP | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05736967.0 | 27.04.2005 | [2007/02] | WO2005JP07994 | Priority number, date | JP20040136129 | 30.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004136129 | [2007/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005105638 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1741654 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/28 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
B65H45/167 (EP,US);
B65H2220/09 (EP,US);
B65H2404/561 (EP,US);
B65H2404/6942 (EP,US);
B65H2511/20 (EP,US);
B65H2511/414 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/20, B65H2220/02, B65H2220/04, B65H2220/11 (EP,US);
B65H2511/414, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PARALLELFALZVORRICHTUNG FÜR FALZMASCHINE | [2007/02] | English: | PARALLEL-FOLDING DEVICE FOR FOLDING MACHINE | [2007/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PLIAGE EN PARALLELE POUR MACHINE A PLIER | [2007/02] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2006 | Translation filed | 27.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 02.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/17] | 07.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0592857 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]JP2002145519 (KOMORI PRINTING MACH) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1209112 (TOKYO KIKAI SEISAKUSHO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP7054205Y ; | [Y]JPS62290680 (KOMORI PRINTING MACH); | [Y]JPH02221063 (KOMORI PRINTING MACH); | [Y]JPH0683665U ; | [Y]JP2002060128 (KOMORI PRINTING MACH); | [X]JP2002145519 (KOMORI PRINTING MACH) |