EP1647099 - TRANSCEIVER AND COMMUNICATION METHOD FOR DIGITAL MULTI-CARRIER COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industries Co., Ltd. 1006 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KODAMA, Nobutaka c/o Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co, Ltd IPROC 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 1-3-7, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
KOGA, Hisao 1-30-2-303, Matunoki, Nakagawa-machi Chikushi-gun, Fukuoka 811-1251 / JP | [2007/11] |
Former [2006/16] | 01 /
KODAMA, Nobutaka 6-13-27-B204, Arita, Sawara-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-0033 / JP | ||
02 /
KOGA, Hisao 1-30-2-303, Matunoki, Nakagawa-machi Chikushi-gun, Fukuoka 811-1251 / JP | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2006/16] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05737044.7 | 26.04.2005 | [2006/16] | WO2005JP08406 | Priority number, date | JP20040133128 | 28.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004133128 | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005107093 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1647099 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1647099 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/54 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
H04B3/54 (EP,US);
H04B2203/54 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSCEIVER UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN ZUR DIGITALEN MEHRTRÄGERKOMMUNIKATION | [2006/16] | English: | TRANSCEIVER AND COMMUNICATION METHOD FOR DIGITAL MULTI-CARRIER COMMUNICATION | [2006/16] | French: | EMETTEUR-RECEPTEUR ET PROCEDE DE COMMUNICATION POUR TELECOMMUNICATION NUMERIQUE A PORTEUSES MULTIPLES | [2006/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.05.2007 | BE | 09.05.2007 | CH | 09.05.2007 | CY | 09.05.2007 | CZ | 09.05.2007 | DK | 09.05.2007 | EE | 09.05.2007 | FI | 09.05.2007 | IT | 09.05.2007 | LI | 09.05.2007 | LT | 09.05.2007 | NL | 09.05.2007 | PL | 09.05.2007 | RO | 09.05.2007 | SI | 09.05.2007 | SK | 09.05.2007 | TR | 09.05.2007 | BG | 09.08.2007 | SE | 09.08.2007 | GR | 10.08.2007 | IS | 09.09.2007 | PT | 09.10.2007 | HU | 10.11.2007 | FR | 04.01.2008 | [2010/39] |
Former [2009/48] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
CY | 09.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
EE | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IT | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LT | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
PL | 09.05.2007 | ||
RO | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
IS | 09.09.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
FR | 04.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
EE | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IT | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LT | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
PL | 09.05.2007 | ||
RO | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
IS | 09.09.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
FR | 04.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IT | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LT | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
PL | 09.05.2007 | ||
RO | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
IS | 09.09.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
FR | 04.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IT | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LT | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
PL | 09.05.2007 | ||
RO | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
IS | 09.09.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IT | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LT | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
PL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
IS | 09.09.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LT | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
PL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
IS | 09.09.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LT | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
PL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
IS | 09.09.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
PL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
IS | 09.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
PL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
IS | 09.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/05] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
PL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
IS | 09.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/52] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
PL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
IS | 09.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4885563 (JOHNSON RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1-3,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5289476 (JOHNSON HOWARD W [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,9,18 * column 7, line 53 - column 8, line 41 *; | [A]DE10026931 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 5,7,14,18 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] *; | [A]EP1162759 (IAD GMBH [DE]) [A] 5,7,14,18 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03003631 (ASCOM POWERLINE COMM AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,9* the whole document *; | [X]WO03069796 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [X] 1-18 * see family member EP 1 475 901 *; | [A]US6727804 (LESGUILLIER ERIC [CA], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 3, line 9 - column 6, line 50 * * claims 1,12,13 *; | EP1475901 [ ] (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [ ] * column 3, line 27 - column 5, line 10 * * claim 1 * |