EP1741684 - MAGNESIUM ALUMINIUM TITANATE CRYSTAL STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/02] | MAGNESIUM ALUMINUM TITANATE CRYSTAL STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | ||
[2018/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ohcera Co., Ltd. 1-19, Uchihonmachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-0026 / JP | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUDA, Tsutomu 785-1, Kunikane, Kamiso-cho Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo 6751213 / JP | 02 /
FUKUDA, Masahiro 94-1-603, Ochiai, Makishima-cho Uji-shi, Kyoto 6110041 / JP | 03 /
FUKUDA, Masaaki 785-1, Kunikane, Kamiso-cho Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo 6751213 / JP | 04 /
YOKO, Toshinobu 31-1-120, Todomonnomae Uji-shi, Kyoto 6110013 / JP | 05 /
TAKAHASHI, Masahide Kyodai Shokuinshukusha 1-113, Gokasho Kanyuchi Uji-shi, Kyoto 6110011 / JP | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [2018/45] |
Former [2009/39] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershauser & Hartz Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05737257.5 | 28.04.2005 | [2007/02] | WO2005JP08226 | Priority number, date | JP20040134662 | 28.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004134662 | [2007/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005105704 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1741684 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1741684 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/478 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
C04B35/465 (EP,US);
C04B35/46 (KR);
C04B35/478 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3463 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3472 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3481 (EP,US);
C04B2235/349 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6562 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/96 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9607 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/45] |
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MAGNESIUMALUMINIUMTITANATKRISTALLSTRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2018/29] | English: | MAGNESIUM ALUMINIUM TITANATE CRYSTAL STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2018/29] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CRISTAL DE TITANATE D'ALUMINIUM DE MAGNESIUM ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2018/29] |
Former [2007/02] | MAGNESIUMALUMINIUMTITANATKRISTALLSTRUKTUR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2007/02] | MAGNESIUM ALUMINUM TITANATE CRYSTAL STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | ||
Former [2007/02] | STRUCTURE DE CTRISTAL DE TITANATE D'ALUMINIUM DE MAGNESIUN ET PROCÉDÉ DE REPRODUCTION DE CE DERNIER | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2006 | Translation filed | 24.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 20.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 01.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2005 | AT | 07.11.2018 | CY | 07.11.2018 | CZ | 07.11.2018 | DK | 07.11.2018 | EE | 07.11.2018 | ES | 07.11.2018 | FI | 07.11.2018 | IT | 07.11.2018 | LT | 07.11.2018 | MC | 07.11.2018 | NL | 07.11.2018 | PL | 07.11.2018 | RO | 07.11.2018 | SE | 07.11.2018 | SI | 07.11.2018 | SK | 07.11.2018 | TR | 07.11.2018 | BG | 07.02.2019 | GR | 08.02.2019 | IS | 07.03.2019 | PT | 07.03.2019 | GB | 28.04.2019 | IE | 28.04.2019 | LU | 28.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | FR | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
GB | 28.04.2019 | ||
IE | 28.04.2019 | ||
LU | 28.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
GB | 28.04.2019 | ||
IE | 28.04.2019 | ||
LU | 28.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
GB | 28.04.2019 | ||
LU | 28.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
GB | 28.04.2019 | ||
LU | 28.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 07.11.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03091183 (FUKUDA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * figure 1; example -; table - *; | [PX]EP1514857 (FUKUDA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [PX] 1-12* figure 1; example -; table - *; | [E]EP1559696 (OHCERA CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-12 * example -; table - *; | [E]EP1645319 (OHCERA CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-12 * figure 4; example -; claim - *; | [E]EP1652830 (OHCERA CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-12 * figure -; example -; table - * | International search | [Y] - GIORDANO L. ET AL, "Microstructure and Thermal Expansion of Al2TiO5-MgTi2O5 Solid Solutions Obtained by Reaction Sintering", JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, (2002), vol. 22, no. 11, pages 1811 - 1822, XP004355160 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0955-2219(01)00503-9 | [Y] - BUSCAGLIA V. ET AL, "Decomposition of Al2TiO5-MgTi2O5 Solid Solutions: A Thermodynamic Approach", JOURNALOF MATERIAL SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 31, no. 19, pages 5009 - 5016, XP002994409 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00355899 | [Y] - DAIMON H. ET AL, "Al2TiO5-MgTi205-kei Haiko Shoketsutai no Chosei to Netsubocho Tokusei", 1990 NEN HAKKO, THE CERAMIC SOCIETY OF JAPAN GAKUJUTSU RONBUNSHI, (1990), vol. 98, no. 4, pages 365 - 369, XP002994410 |