EP1753854 - SYNERGISTIC SURFACTANT MIXTURES WITH HIGHER DYNAMIC PROPERTIES AND LOWER CMC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OETTER, Günter Hans-von-Marees-Str. 21 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
HESS, Stephan Brunhildestr. 24 68199 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
STEINBRENNER, Ulrich Müller-Thurgau-Weg 20 67435 Neustadt / DE | 04 /
TROPSCH, Jürgen Im Oberen Berg 81 67354 Römerberg / DE | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | Isenbruck, Günter Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05737894.5 | 28.04.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005EP04571 | Priority number, date | DE20041021208 | 29.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004021208 | [2007/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005105964 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1753854 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/83, C11D1/94, B01F17/00 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
C11D1/83 (EP,US);
C11D1/825 (EP,US);
C11D1/94 (EP,US);
C11D1/123 (EP,US);
C11D1/72 (EP,US);
C11D1/75 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/08] | C11D1/83, C11D1/94, C11D1/825, B01F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNERGISTISCHE TENSIDMISCHUNGEN MIT HOHER DYNAMIK UND NIEDRIGER CMC | [2007/08] | English: | SYNERGISTIC SURFACTANT MIXTURES WITH HIGHER DYNAMIC PROPERTIES AND LOWER CMC | [2007/08] | French: | MELANGES D'AGENTS TENSIOACTIFS AGISSANT EN SYNERGIE AYANT UN DYNAMISME ELEVE ET UNE CMC REDUITE | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 12.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/38] | 29.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH08283785 ; | [X]US3914185 (INAMORATO JACK THOMAS) [X] 9 * example XXII *; | [DX]US3929678 (LAUGHLIN ROBERT GENE, et al) [DX] 1-3,5-7,9 * claim -; table - *; | [A]US4434087 (HAMPSON JEFFREY D [GB], et al) [A] 1-7,9,10 * claim - *; | [X]EP0393908 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 9 * claim -; table 9 *; | [X]US5160658 (SMITH KIM R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9 * column 2; claim - *; | [X]WO9520028 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 7 * page 4; claim - * * page 11 *; | [XD]WO9919438 (STEPAN CO [US], et al) [XD] 9 * claim - *; | [XA]EP1035195 (DROM FRAGRANCES INT KG [DE]) [X] 9,11 * example -; claim - * [A] 8; | [X]EP1126012 (BODE CHEMIE GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 9* paragraph [0045]; examples 4,5; claim - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08283785 A 19961029 (LION CORP) [X] 7 * abstract * |