EP1725150 - CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BLANCO CS GmbH + Co KG Flehinger Strasse 59 75038 Oberderdingen / DE | [2008/03] |
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states BLANCO GmbH + Co KG Flehinger Strasse 59 75038 Oberderdingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WURST, Wolfgang Hans-Freytag-Strasse 31 72760 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
HINTERMAYER, Michael Weiherer Strasse 81 76698 Ubstadt-Weiher / DE | 03 /
NEULINGER, Helmut Bussental 11/3 75038 Oberderdingen / DE | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2006/48] | Hörner, Andreas HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05738117.0 | 11.03.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005EP02611 | Priority number, date | DE20041012367 | 13.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004012367 | [2006/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005087064 | Date: | 22.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1725150 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1725150 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/00, A47J36/02 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
A47J27/002 (EP);
A47J36/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES BEHÄLTERS | [2006/48] | English: | CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A CONTAINER | [2006/48] | French: | CONTENANT ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.01.2008 | CZ | 23.01.2008 | DK | 23.01.2008 | EE | 23.01.2008 | FI | 23.01.2008 | IE | 23.01.2008 | LT | 23.01.2008 | RO | 23.01.2008 | SI | 23.01.2008 | SK | 23.01.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | BG | 23.04.2008 | SE | 23.04.2008 | GR | 24.04.2008 | IS | 23.05.2008 | PT | 23.06.2008 | HU | 24.07.2008 | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/39] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
HU | 24.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/48] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | CZ | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
IS | 23.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB348875 (WILLIAM SAMUEL BULPITT, et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-10,12,14,15,18,22-25,29 * page 2, lines 13-64; figures 1,2,6; claim 1 *; | [XA]GB471328 (PAUL SPIESS) [X] 1-6,12,14,15,22-26 * page 2, lines 53-73; figures 1-3 * [A] 11,13,19,30; | [X]GB641240 (ADOLF BERGNER) [X] 1,6,8-10,14,15,18,22,29 * page 1, lines 19-40; figure 1 *; | [XA]GB2222935 (G W PEARCE & SONS LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1-6,8-10,12-15,19,21-26,29 * pages 4-5; figures 1-4; claim 27 * [A] 16; | [X]US2002148838 (SIM JAE JUNG [KR]) [X] 1,6,14-18,20,22* the whole document * |