EP1765180 - CLOSURE DEVICE WITH HINGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NMT Medical, Inc. 27 Wormwood Street Boston, MA 02210 / US | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANDUSZKO, Andrzej, J. 311 N. Carriage Lane Chandler, AZ 85224 / US | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul William, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | Chapman, Paul William, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05738706.0 | 22.04.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005US13705 | Priority number, date | US20040569203P | 07.05.2004 Original published format: US 569203 P | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005112779 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1765180 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1765180 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00243 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00575 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00592 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00606 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00619 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00623 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG MIT SCHARNIEREN | [2007/13] | English: | CLOSURE DEVICE WITH HINGES | [2007/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE AVEC CHARNIÈRES | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.11.2009 | BE | 18.11.2009 | CY | 18.11.2009 | CZ | 18.11.2009 | DK | 18.11.2009 | EE | 18.11.2009 | FI | 18.11.2009 | IT | 18.11.2009 | LT | 18.11.2009 | NL | 18.11.2009 | PL | 18.11.2009 | RO | 18.11.2009 | SE | 18.11.2009 | SI | 18.11.2009 | SK | 18.11.2009 | TR | 18.11.2009 | BG | 18.02.2010 | GR | 19.02.2010 | ES | 28.02.2010 | IS | 18.03.2010 | PT | 18.03.2010 | IE | 22.04.2010 | LU | 22.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | FR | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | HU | 19.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
IE | 22.04.2010 | ||
LU | 22.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
IE | 22.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
IE | 22.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
IE | 22.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
IE | 22.04.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
IE | 22.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 18.11.2009 | |
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | LT | 18.11.2009 | |
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 28.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE9413645U (SCHNEIDT BERNHARD ING GRAD [DE]) [A] 4* figure 2 *; | [Y]US6312446 (HUEBSCH JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,7-15,18-21 * column 4, line 28 - line 54; figures 2-4 * * column 6, line 43 - column 7, line 20; figures 14-17 *; | [A]US2003171774 (FREUDENTHAL FRANZ [EC], et al) [A] 1,14,19 * paragraph [0077]; figure 13 * * paragraph [0082]; figure 14b *; | [Y]WO03103476 (NMT MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,7-15,18-21 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034]; figures 2-7 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0064] * * figures 11,12; claim 34 * |