EP1862026 - Handover in a WCDMA radio access network based on neighbour-cell lists dependent on Iu-interface identity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/49] | METHOD AND SYSTEM OF RADIO COMMUNICATION | ||
[2010/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) Patent Unit 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) Patent Unit 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURTENBACK, Ros-Marie Pastellvägen 34 S-121 36 Johanneshov / SE | 02 /
WAHLBERG, Ulrik Reduttvägen 108 S-187 68 Täby / SE | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 05739160.9 | 23.03.2005 | [2007/49] | WO2005SE00443 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006101426 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1862026 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1862026 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/08 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
H04W36/0061 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/49] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Weiterreichung in einem WCDMA Funkzugangsnetz anhand von Listen von Nachbarzellen in Abhängigkeit von der Kennung der Iu-Schnittstelle | [2010/28] | English: | Handover in a WCDMA radio access network based on neighbour-cell lists dependent on Iu-interface identity | [2010/28] | French: | Transfert dans un réseau d'accès radio du type WDCMA au moyen de listes de cellules voisines dépendantes de l'identité d'une interface Iu | [2010/28] |
Former [2007/49] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR FUNKKOMMUNIKATION | ||
Former [2007/49] | METHOD AND SYSTEM OF RADIO COMMUNICATION | ||
Former [2007/49] | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS RADIO | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 09.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.12.2010 | BE | 08.12.2010 | CY | 08.12.2010 | CZ | 08.12.2010 | DK | 08.12.2010 | EE | 08.12.2010 | FI | 08.12.2010 | HU | 08.12.2010 | IT | 08.12.2010 | LT | 08.12.2010 | PL | 08.12.2010 | RO | 08.12.2010 | SE | 08.12.2010 | SI | 08.12.2010 | SK | 08.12.2010 | TR | 08.12.2010 | BG | 08.03.2011 | GR | 09.03.2011 | ES | 19.03.2011 | IE | 23.03.2011 | LU | 23.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | FR | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | IS | 08.04.2011 | PT | 08.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
TR | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
LU | 23.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
LU | 23.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 08.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1107622 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [X]US2002105927 (HOLMA HARRI [FI], et al); | [A]US2002151304 (HOGAN WILLIAM D [IE]); | [A]US2003013443 (WILLARS PER [SE], et al) | by applicant | US2002105927 | WO02065805 | WO02065806 | WO02065807 | WO02065808 | US2002151304 | US2003013443 |