EP1747197 - REGIOSELECTIVE FUNCTIONALISATION AND PROTECTION OF SPIROLACTAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LABORATORIOS DEL DR. ESTEVE, S.A. Av. Mare de Déu de Montserrat, 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | [2007/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOHEDA MARIN, Pedro Avda. de los Labradores, 14, 5 -2 E-28760 Tres Cantos - Madrid / ES | 02 /
BERNABE PAJARES, Manuel Mota del Cuervo, 16, 3º - 3 E-28043 Madrid / ES | 03 /
MAROTO QUINTANA, Sergio Islas Cíes, 13, 3ª esc., 2º - 2 E-28035 Madrid / ES | 04 /
TABARES CANTERO, Nuria Avda. Manzanares, 92, 7º izd E-28019 Madrid / ES | 05 /
BENITO ARENAS, Raul Cardenal Aguirre, 6, 4º A dcha. E-09001 Burgos / ES | [2007/05] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2007/05] | ABG Patentes, S.L. C/Orense, 68 7th floor 28020 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 05739512.1 | 10.05.2005 | [2007/05] | WO2005EP05149 | Priority number, date | ES20040001123 | 10.05.2004 Original published format: ES 200401123 | EP20040380104 | 10.05.2004 Original published format: EP 04380104 | US20040846466 | 14.05.2004 Original published format: US 846466 | EP20040076477 | 20.05.2004 Original published format: EP 04076477 | US20040853639 | 25.05.2004 Original published format: US 853639 | ES20040001285 | 27.05.2004 Original published format: ES 200401285 | EP20040380295 | 30.12.2004 Original published format: EP 04380295 | US20050047860 | 01.02.2005 Original published format: US 47860 | [2007/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005108357 | Date: | 17.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1747197 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D205/12 | [2007/05] | CPC: |
C07D205/12 (EP,US);
C07C271/16 (EP,US);
C07D491/048 (EP,US);
C07D491/056 (EP,US);
C07D491/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | 04.12.2006 | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REGIOSELEKTIVE FUNKTIONALISIERUNG UND REGIOSELEKTIVES SCHÜTZEN VON SPIROLAKTAMEN | [2007/05] | English: | REGIOSELECTIVE FUNCTIONALISATION AND PROTECTION OF SPIROLACTAMS | [2007/05] | French: | FONCTIONNALISATION STEREOSELECTIVE ET PROTECTION DE SPIROLACTAMES | [2007/05] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/05] | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/24] | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9417038 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [DA] 1-23 * examples 8,9 *; | [AD] - KIKUGAWA YASUO ET AL, "Formation of lactams and spiro fused lactams", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 68, no. 17, pages 6739 - 6744, XP002303080 [AD] 1-23 * examples 1-4; table 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo0347009 | [A] - SNIDER, BARRY ET AL, "Synthesis of Desmethylamino FR901483", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 63, pages 6442 - 6443, XP002303135 [A] 1-23 * compound 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo981292d | [A] - BRAUN, NORBERT ET AL, "Synthesis of Spirolactams from Tyrosine amides and related substances", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1998), vol. 39, pages 4667 - 4670, XP002303136 [A] 1-23 * compound 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(98)00874-0 |